I.M., a minor, by and through his Parent v. Santa Clara Unified School District

Plaintiff: I.M. a minor, by and through his Parent and Guardian, at Litem, Kamal Methta (Father), an Individual
Defendant: Santa Clara Unified School District, Robert Griffin, Joy Shmueli and Leslie Robinson
Case Number: 5:2016cv00719
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/17/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
November 16, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 26 SETTLEMENT OF MINOR'S CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/16/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
July 25, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING STATUS UPDATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
June 2, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 15 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 05/24/2018 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 9/10/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. B eth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018, 9/11/2018, 9/12/2018, 9/13/2018, 9/14/2018, 9/17/2018, 9/18/2018, 9/19/2018, 9/20/2018 and 9/21/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/02/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.M., a minor, by and through his Parent v. Santa Clara Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Clara Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joy Shmueli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.M. a minor, by and through his Parent and Guardian, at Litem, Kamal Methta (Father), an Individual
Represented By: James Blake Sibley
Represented By: David Henry Tollner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?