Langell et al v. Ideal Homes LLC

Plaintiff: Jim Langell and Rhonda Langell
Defendant: Ideal Homes LLC and CMH Manufacturing West, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00821
Filed: February 18, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 17, 2016 71 Opinion or Order of the Court Order discharging 55 order to show cause re: probable violation of Rule 11 signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 11/17/2016. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
September 9, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court Order to Show Cause Re Probable Violation of Rule 11, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to Attorney Charles S. Redfield of the Law Firm of Low, Ball & Lynch. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 9/21/2016, 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2, Fifth Floor, San Jose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 9/9/2016. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2016)
May 27, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 17 Motion for Leave to Serve and File Third-Party Complaint. (hrllc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langell et al v. Ideal Homes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Langell
Represented By: Paul Gerard Minoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Langell
Represented By: Paul Gerard Minoletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ideal Homes LLC
Represented By: Charles Scranton Redfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMH Manufacturing West, Inc.
Represented By: Christie Bahna
Represented By: Christian Edward Baker
Represented By: Barry William Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?