Codexis, Inc. v. EnzymeWorks, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Codexis, Inc.
Defendant: EnzymeWorks, Inc. and Junhua Tao
Case Number: 5:2016cv00826
Filed: February 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: William H. Orrick
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2018 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING DEFENDANTS IN CONTEMPT AND AWARDING PLAINTIFF COMPENSATORY SANCTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick re: 190 Motion. Codexis is awarded its reasonable attorneys' fees and costs incurred in connection with these contempt proceeding s and with their efforts to secure defendants' compliance with the SPO. In the event the parties do not reach agreement within ten days of this Order, Codexis may file an accounting of its recoverable fees and costs with a motion for payment of said fees and costs. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
February 6, 2018 186 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT OF PATENT INFRINGEMENT. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 02/06/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
January 4, 2018 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO CONTINUE THE DEADLINE FOR CODEXIS'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS 166 OMNIBUS MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY AND TO VACATE THE DEADLINE FOR EXPERT REBUTTAL REPORTS - Reply in support of 166 MOTION to Compel due by 1/10/2018.Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/04/2018. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2018)
December 28, 2017 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 172 Stipulation. Motion Hearing as to 166 MOTION to Compel reset for 1/24/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Judge William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 12/28/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
December 4, 2017 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON MOTIONS by Judge William H. Orrick denying 128 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; granting 134 Motion for Disclosure; and granting 143 Motion for Disclosure. Defendants 137 motion to dismiss the 17th and 18th cla ims, as well as their motion for leave to file a motion for reconsideration, are DENIED. LiLaw shall pay plaintiff $10,000 as civil sanctions as a result of the violation of Civil Local Rule 7-9(c) and for needlessly multiplying this litigation. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2017)
September 25, 2017 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT by Judge William H. Orrick granting 103 Motion for Leave to File. Amended Complaint due by 9/28/2017. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 22, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 120 STIPULATION to Change the Hearing Date for Defendants' Motion to Strike. Motion Hearing reset for 10/25/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 09/22/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
August 17, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 106 STIPULATION - Resetting deadlines as to 103 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/17/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2017)
June 26, 2017 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 90 STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadlines. Close of Fact Discovery due by 8/30/2017. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 06/26/2017. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
August 30, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED ORDER RE: DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 08/30/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2016)
August 11, 2016 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 34 MOTION TO DISMISS by Hon. William H. Orrick. Defendants' motion to dismiss the agency theory of liability and the unfairness prong of the UCL claim is GRANTED with leave to amend within twenty days of this Order. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2016)
May 26, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 STIPULATION to continued hearing as to 34 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing continued to 6/29/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William H. Orrick. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/26/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2016)
May 20, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 05/20/2016. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Codexis, Inc. v. EnzymeWorks, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Codexis, Inc.
Represented By: Karan Singh Dhadialla
Represented By: Gabriel S. Gross
Represented By: Douglas E. Lumish
Represented By: Pei Hsien Ren
Represented By: Patricia Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EnzymeWorks, Inc.
Represented By: Ezekiel Lee Rauscher
Represented By: Li Shen
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Samuel N. Tiu
Represented By: Ezekiel Lee Rauscher
Represented By: Li Shen
Represented By: M. Patricia Thayer
Represented By: Samuel N. Tiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Junhua Tao
Represented By: Ezekiel Lee Rauscher
Represented By: Li Shen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?