Zeitler v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Scott Ronald Zeitler
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv00862
Filed: February 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 17 Stipulation for extension oftime for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 8/29/2016. Replies due by 9/12/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/27/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2016)
July 12, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Because Plaintiff has since complied with its requirements, the Order to Show Cause issued on 6/28/2016 (Dkt. No. 12 ), is DISCHARGED. Further briefing shall occur according to the scheduling order filed on 2/23/2016 (Dkt. No. 6 ). Signed by Hon. Edward J. Davila on 7/12/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)
June 28, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 4:00 p.m. on 7/1/2016, file a motion for summary judgment or for remand, the court will dismiss this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zeitler v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Ronald Zeitler
Represented By: Mark Hanley Lipton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Sundeep Ravindra Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?