Bridgestone Brands, LLC et al v. Dastgah

Plaintiff: Bridgestone Brands, LLC and Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Defendant: Hassan Dastgah
Case Number: 5:2016cv00906
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 31 Case Management Conference - Further, Last Day to Amend Pleadings and Add Parties 07/15/2016. Discovery Cut-off 12/09/2016. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 02/02/2017 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Confere nce set for 4/6/2017 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 4/24/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 4/24/2017, 4/25/2017, 4/26/2017, 4/27/2017, and 4/28/2017 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/02/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
March 18, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 11 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2016)
February 29, 2016 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR MARCH 17, 2016 AT 2:30 P.M. ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/29/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/29/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bridgestone Brands, LLC et al v. Dastgah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Brands, LLC
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: Robert Francis McCauley
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassan Dastgah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?