Pajas et al v. County of Monterey et al
Plaintiff: Mark Vasquez Pajas, Sr., Rosemary Lopez, Yvette Pajas, Mark Pajas, Jr., Janel Pajas and Xavier Pajas
Defendant: County of Monterey, King City, King City Police Department, Tony Sollecito, Steve Bernal, Steve Orozco, California Forensic Medical Group and Christina Kaupp
Case Number: 5:2016cv00945
Filed: February 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 301 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/20/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Jury Verdict)(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2019)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 295 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER RE FINANCIAL DOCUMENTS OF DEFENDANTS CALIFORNIA FORENSIC MEDICAL GROUP, INC. AND CHRISTINA KAUPP (granting 290 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/7/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2019)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 JOINT PRETRIAL STATEMENT AND ORDER (adopting 182 as modified by the Court). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2019)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE (addressing 178 , 179 , 180 , 181 , 183 , 184 , 185 , 186 , 187 , 190 , 191 , 192 , 193 , 194 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/14/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING 152 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 151 COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND DENYING 155 CFMG DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/5/2018. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER DENYING 153 PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/10/2018.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 136 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST OF MAY 19, 2017. Status Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Signed by Magistrat e Judge Susan van Keulen on 5/31/2017. Parties requesting to appear telephonically are instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017) Modified on 5/31/2017 to correct status conference date from 6/2/2017 to 6/22/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REASONABLE EXPENSES AND SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT CFMG, re 118 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 4/20/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE: JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF (In Re: ECF No. 112 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/6/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2017)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FURTHER ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/17/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FURTHER ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL, re 96 . Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 2/14/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2017)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING 100 PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE FEBRUARY 14, 2017 FURTHER DISCOVERY HEARING by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel is instructed to contact CourtCall at 866-582-6878 to arrange for telephonic appearance(svklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2017)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 66 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2016)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 28 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2016)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 23, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REGARDING KING CITY'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on June 22, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2016)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE, denying ECF No. 533 in 5:13-cv-02354-PSG: The court has reviewed the motion and determined that no cases are related and no reassignments shall occur. 5:16-cv-00945-LHK is NOT RELATED to 5:13-cv-02354-PSG. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pajas et al v. County of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Vasquez Pajas, Sr.
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Lopez
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Pajas
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Pajas, Jr.
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janel Pajas
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Pajas
Represented By: Cindy Panuco
Represented By: Joshua Piovia-Scott
Represented By: Lori Rifkin
Represented By: Dan Lewis Stormer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King City Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Sollecito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Orozco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Kaupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?