Parker v. County Of Monterey et al

Plaintiff: Kali Parker
Defendant: County Of Monterey, Stephen Bernal, California Forensic Medical Group, Taylor Fithian, David Harness, Lola Bayer, Eluid Garcia and Scott Miller
Case Number: 5:2016cv00960
Filed: February 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2017 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/19/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 13, 2016 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Re: Dkt. No. 34 . By July 20, Parker must file a status update with the Court clarifying if the filing of a second amended complaint moots the motion to file a first amended complaint. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/13/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)
June 7, 2016 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Re: Dkt. Nos. 9 14 . Parker may amend the complaint within 14 days. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. County Of Monterey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kali Parker
Represented By: Michael Edward Adams
Represented By: Ross Benjamin Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Of Monterey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bernal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Harness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lola Bayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eluid Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?