Cobert v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Silvia Cobert
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc, Trans Union, LLC, HSBC BANK, USA, National Association and AD Astra Recovery Services, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01115
Filed: March 4, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2016 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. The parties are ordered to appear on 10/27/2016 at 10:00 AM to show cause why the case should not be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). On or before 10/20/2016, the parties shall file a joint statement. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/20/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2016)
August 1, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. 1.The parties shall comply with the deadlines provided in the Case Management Order filed on 6/20/2016 33 . 2. In addition, the parties shall complete mediation by the deadline provided in the order fi led on 6/20/2016 32 . 3. The Further Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/4/2016 is CONTINUED to 10:00 a.m. on 10/6/2016. THE COURTCALL REQUEST 37 GRANTED BY ORDER 39 IS MOOT AND COUNSEL SAHLL CONTACT COURTCALL TO CANCEL THE APPEARANCE. The parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement on or before 9/29/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016) Modified text on 8/1/2016 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
June 28, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVAL re 34 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT AD ASTRA RECOVERY SERVICES, INC. PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(A)(1). The Clerk shall terminate Defendant Ad Astra Recovery Services, Inc. ONLY from this action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/28/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cobert v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvia Cobert
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc
Represented By: Alyssa Marie Staudinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC BANK, USA, National Association
Represented By: Paul Aldo Grammatico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AD Astra Recovery Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher David Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?