Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc. v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge No. 93 et al

Plaintiff: Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc.
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge No. 93, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, Local No. 890, International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, Cement, Lime, Gypsum and Allied Workers Division, DNCL, International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local No. 234 and International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 3
Case Number: 5:2016cv01331
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 29, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/29/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2016)
June 27, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Request to Appear Telephonicially at the June 29, 2016 Motion to Dismiss Hearing 21 filed by Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc. Counsel must be available beginning at 1:00 PM until called by the Court. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/27/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 23, 2016 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF ADDITIONAL TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT BOILMAKERS UNION. Re: Dkt. No. 19 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/22/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF SERVICE TO DEFENDANT BOILERMAKERS UNION. Re: Dkt. No. 1 . Plaintiff Lhoist is ordered to explain the status of the service of the complaint on Boilmakers Union by 6/17/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/10/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2016)
June 2, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference 12 . Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2016. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 6/2/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc. v. International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge No. 93 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Association of Machinists and Aerospace Workers, Local Lodge No. 93
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen and Helpers of America, Local No. 890
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers, AFL-CIO, Cement, Lime, Gypsum and Allied Workers Division, DNCL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local No. 234
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union of Operating Engineers, Local No. 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lhoist North America of Arizona, Inc.
Represented By: Conor John Dale
Represented By: Dan Hartsfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?