Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc. v. Boston East Tyngsboro Holdings, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Boston East Tyngsboro Holdings, LLC, Boston East India Holdings, LLC, Stonehedge Cellars, LLC and Benchmark Wine Group, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv01361
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 49 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 31 MOTION to Expedite Jurisdictional Discovery. Motion Hearing set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 27, 2016 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 41 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 31 MOTION to Expedite Jurisdictional Discovery filed by Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc. Motions terminated: 32 MOTION to Change Time for Briefing fi led by Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc. . Motion 31 to Expedite Jurisdictional Discovery set for 6/21/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2016)
May 17, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 Stipulation Extend Deadline to Respond filed by Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on May 17, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 20, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to the case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 4/20/2016. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016) (Entered: 04/20/2016)ORDER (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc. v. Boston East Tyngsboro Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smith-Anderson Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: J. Scott Gerien
Represented By: John D Mason
Represented By: Christopher James Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston East Tyngsboro Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston East India Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonehedge Cellars, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Wine Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?