Sandhu et al v. Bhogart, LLC

Plaintiff: Sean Sandhu
Defendant: Thomas Lynch and Bogart, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv01456
Filed: March 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 5, 2016 47 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 8/5/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)
June 27, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO PAY SANCTIONS. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 16, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST DEFENDANTS AND (2) ISSUING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AGAINST COUNSEL. Show Cause Response due by 6/27/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim on 6/16/2016. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 8, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) SETTING A HEARING DATE AND (2) DIRECTING DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/15/2016. Motion Hearing re: 17 MOTION to Strike Affirmative Defenses, 16 MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages, 14 MOTION to Dismiss Counter Claim set for 7/20/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2016)
May 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Paul S. Grewal on May 9, 2016 (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sandhu et al v. Bhogart, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Lynch
Represented By: Drew Franklin Teti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bogart, LLC
Represented By: Drew Franklin Teti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Sandhu
Represented By: Cary S. Kletter
Represented By: Trung Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?