Thompson v. Centerplate of Delaware, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Gabriel Thompson
Defendant: Centerplate of Delaware, Inc., Centerplate Inc., Chris Verros, Jeff Tandberg, Adrian Sishington, Hadi K. Manovar and Kevin McNamara
Case Number: 5:2016cv01486
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT. The Clerk shall close this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/30/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)
July 29, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. The Order to Show Cause re: Settlement is DISCHARGED and the hearing scheduled for 8/4/2016 is VACATED. The court schedules this action for a Status Conference at 10:00 a.m. on 9/1/ 2016. On or before 8/25/2016, the parties shall file a Joint Status Conference Statement which provides, inter alia, an update on the anticipated motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/29/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
May 16, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Stipulated Dismissal or Joint Statment due by 7/28/2016. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/4/2016 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. All other pretrial deadlines and he aring dates are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Failure to comply with any part of this Order will be deemed sufficient grounds to dismiss the action. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/16/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Centerplate of Delaware, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerplate of Delaware, Inc.
Represented By: Steve Lou Hernandez
Represented By: Rachel T. Segal
Represented By: Scott J. Witlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerplate Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Verros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Tandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Sishington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hadi K. Manovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel Thompson
Represented By: David Albert Rosenfeld
Represented By: Caren P. Sencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?