SlashSupport, Inc. v. Choodamani

Plaintiff: SlashSupport, Inc.
Defendant: Natarajan Choodamani
Case Number: 5:2016cv01505
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 2, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION, ENTERING PERMANENT INJUNCTION, AND FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2016)
May 23, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE BRIEFING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 8/11/2016 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/20/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2016)
March 31, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 21 STIPULATION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/31/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2016)
March 28, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE RE 3 APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Response due by 3/30/2016. Motion Hearing set for 3/31/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SlashSupport, Inc. v. Choodamani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SlashSupport, Inc.
Represented By: Kurt A. Franklin
Represented By: Jay Rapaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natarajan Choodamani
Represented By: David Warren Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?