Guerrero v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Guerrero
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc. and OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv01519
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2016 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 31 , 37 CALIBER HOME LOANS, INC.'S AND OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, LLC'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/14/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2016)
August 17, 2016 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 12 MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
June 30, 2016 35 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANGEMENT ORDER re 34 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 01/11/2018 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/29/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 4/16/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 4/16/2018, 04/17/2018, 04/18/2018, 04/19/2018, 04/20/2018, 04/23/2018, 04/24/2018, 04/25/2018, 04/26/2018 and 04/27/2018 at 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Case referred to ADR for Mediation. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 06/30/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine Elizabeth Kruger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCWEN Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Guerrero
Represented By: Kenley Charles Dygert
Represented By: Jack Ter-Saakyan
Represented By: Nicholas H Van Parys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?