Jay E's Basement et al v. Diamond S.J. Enterprise et al

Plaintiff: Jay E's Basement, Universal Music Corporation, Jackie Frost Music, Inc., D2 Pro Publishing, Sam Swap Publishing, Tarpo Music Publishing, Young Dude Publishing, Songs of Peer, Ltd., 2082 Publishing, Marchninenth Music, WB Music Corp. and Naughty Music
Defendant: Diamond SJ Enterprise, David R. Koehler and Jenny R. Wolfes
Case Number: 5:2016cv01911
Filed: April 12, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Re: ECF 34 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/13/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
July 23, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 25 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/10/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/22/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2016)
July 12, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE 15 . Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/3/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose. Defendants to file their consent or declination by 7/26/2016. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/12/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jay E's Basement et al v. Diamond S.J. Enterprise et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay E's Basement
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Music Corporation
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Frost Music, Inc.
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D2 Pro Publishing
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Swap Publishing
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tarpo Music Publishing
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Young Dude Publishing
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Songs of Peer, Ltd.
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 2082 Publishing
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marchninenth Music
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naughty Music
Represented By: Erica M Connolly
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond SJ Enterprise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny R. Wolfes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?