Defenders of Wildlife et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al

Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife, Sierra Club and Santa Clara Valley Audubon Society
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service and U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Intervenor_dft: Panoche Valley Solar, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv01993
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 30:181
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2016 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh denying 24 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Preliminary Injunction. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)
June 29, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 6/29/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2016)
May 20, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Additional Questions for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/20/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
May 18, 2016 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Supplemental Briefing and Questions for Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/18/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2016)
April 20, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 4/20/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defenders of Wildlife et al v. U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Defenders of Wildlife
Represented By: Jason Craig Rylander
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Jason Craig Rylander
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Clara Valley Audubon Society
Represented By: Jason Craig Rylander
Represented By: James Jay Tutchton
Represented By: Rachel Justine Zwillinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Represented By: Jeremy Hessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Paul Cirino
Represented By: Jeremy Hessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_dft: Panoche Valley Solar, LLC
Represented By: Christopher J. Carr
Represented By: Navtej Singh Dhillon
Represented By: Lawrence Javier Serrano
Represented By: William M. Sloan, Esq.
Represented By: Lala Tiao Tiao Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?