Butler v. Porsche Cars North America, Inc.

Plaintiff: Paul B Butler
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv02042
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh denying 44 motion for class certification; granting in part 61 administrative motion to file surreply.(lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2017)
March 24, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON 56 STIPULATION TO MODIFY PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen on 3/24/2017. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2017)
August 25, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2016)
July 21, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 7/21/2016. (lhklc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butler v. Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul B Butler
Represented By: Michael D. Braun
Represented By: Roy Arie Katriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By: Yvonne Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?