First Mercury Insurance Company v. Great Divide Insurance Company

Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Defendant: Great Divide Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2016cv02114
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting in part and denying in part 15 Motion to Dismiss; denying Motion for a Stay. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2016)
July 25, 2016 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 25, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2016)
July 21, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on July 21, 2016. (lhklc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Mercury Insurance Company v. Great Divide Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Jodi Krystyn Swick
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Tittmann
Represented By: Edward Joseph Valdespino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Divide Insurance Company
Represented By: Maria S Quintero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?