Reynaldo Llamas v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Reynaldo Llamas
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association and TD Bank USA, National Association
Case Number: 5:2016cv02164
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 7, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 5/11/2017 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 5/4/2017. All other pretrial deadlines and hearing dates, including those scheduled in the Pretrial Order 57 , are VACATED and any pending motions are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/7/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
February 6, 2017 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 49 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 2/6/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
July 21, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 31 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Chase Bank USA, N.A. Erroneously sued as JPMorgan Chase Bank, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/21/2016. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
June 16, 2016 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 20 Stipulation filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association. Response due 6/28/2016. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/16/2016. (ecg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reynaldo Llamas v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaldo Llamas
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine Anne Neben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, National Association
Represented By: Julieta Stepanyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?