Chakweva v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kanosi Chakweva
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, Ditech Financial, LLC and Synchrony Bank
Case Number: 5:2016cv02231
Filed: April 25, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 12:00 p.m. on 11/28/2016, file or cause to be filed a Joint Trial Setting Conference Statement which conforms to the undersigneds Standing Order for Civil Cases or demonstrate good cause in writing wh y this case should not be dismissed, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be held on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court. The Further Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/8/2016 is VACATED as unnecessary. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/23/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
October 5, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, by 10/7/2016, file or cause to be filed a case management conference statement, the court will dismiss the action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). No hearing will be he ld on the order to show cause unless otherwise ordered by the court.The Further Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 10/6/2016 is VACATED and will be reset, if necessary, upon resolution of the issue addressed herein. The motion to appear by telephone 49 is TERMINATED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/5/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
August 1, 2016 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiff does not, no later than 8/8/2016, either: (1) file documents to show proof of service of the Summons and Complaint on Experian; or (2) explain in writing why service has not been accomplished, the court will dismiss Experian without prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chakweva v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kanosi Chakweva
Represented By: Joseph Brian Angelo
Represented By: Elliot Wayne Gale
Represented By: Scott Matthew Johnson
Represented By: Scott Joseph Sagaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Christopher A. Ferguson
Represented By: Lauren E. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial, LLC
Represented By: Alisa Alexandra Givental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synchrony Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?