Guthmann v. Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Guthmann
Defendant: Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership and CC-Palo Alto, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv02680
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Lucy H. Koh
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Granting 42 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; Granting in Part and Denying in Part 60 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order by Hon. Lucy H. Koh Granting 41 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(lhklc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 38 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SECOND INTERIM ORDER re 38 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 2. Parties to file supplemental joint report by 6/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/31/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 INTERIM ORDER re 44 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 3. Parties' supplement due by 4:00 PM, 5/30/2017. Hearing set for 5/31/2017, 1:30 PM. Lead counsel must appear in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/24/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 INTERIM ORDER re 38 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/10/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2017)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 32 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2017)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Interim Order re 32 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 4/7/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guthmann v. Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Guthmann
Represented By: Erica Christina Gonzalez
Represented By: Peter Collins McMahon
Represented By: Paul Joseph Smoot
Represented By: Margaret M Widlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Residence Management Limited Partnership
Represented By: Jenna Heather Leyton-Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CC-Palo Alto, Inc.
Represented By: Jenna Heather Leyton-Jones
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?