Mahamedi et al v. Paradice et al

Plaintiff: Mahamedi IP Law, LLP and Zurvan Mahamedi
Defendant: Paradice & Li, LLP and William Paradice, III
Case Number: 5:2016cv02805
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2017 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 94 STIPULATION RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/30/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 112 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO WITHDRAW MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/29/2017. The 7/6/2017 hearing is VACATED. No appearance necessary. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
April 20, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 102 PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/20/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahamedi et al v. Paradice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mahamedi IP Law, LLP
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurvan Mahamedi
Represented By: Perry J. Narancic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradice & Li, LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Paradice, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?