Armstrong v. The City of San Jose et al

Plaintiff: David Armstrong
Defendant: The City of San Jose, Alexander Keller, Officer Baldwin, Officer Zarate and Officer Bortolotti
Case Number: 5:2016cv02938
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 11, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/11/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2017)
May 9, 2017 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 36 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DATE FOR EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/9/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)
April 4, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY). The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 4/13/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. The parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the Order. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 10/12/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 11/14/2017 09:00 AM, Jury Trial set for 11/14/2017 01:30 PM. Jury Trial dates:11/15 09:00 AM, 11/17 09:00 AM, 11/21 09:00 AM, 11/22 09:00 AM (deliberations). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/4/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
January 17, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 15 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. The hearing on the Motion to Dismiss set for 1/19/2017 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/17/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2017) Modified text on 1/17/2017 (amkS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. The City of San Jose et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Armstrong
Represented By: Nicholas Garrett Emanuel
Represented By: Stephen Arthur Horner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zarate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bortolotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?