Jose Bautista v. R. Diaz

Defendant: R. Diaz
Petitioner: Jose Bautista
Case Number: 5:2016cv03174
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF RESPONDENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 7/11/2017. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2017)
September 2, 2016 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/2/2016. (Corrected as to name of Respondent). (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
September 1, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/1/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Bautista v. R. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Bautista
Represented By: Manuel Urquidez Aldapa Araujo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?