Vaccaro v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Plaintiff: Melissa Vaccaro
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 5:2016cv03220
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/28/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2017)
November 20, 2017 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 32 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 52 AND DENYING 31 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT UNDER RULE 52; FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/20/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2017)
June 5, 2017 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 24 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA DIRECTED AT NETAPP INC. AND VACATING HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/5/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaccaro v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Vaccaro
Represented By: James Pieper Keenley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?