Space Data Corporation v. Alphabet Inc.,Google LLC, and Loon LLC

Plaintiff: Space Data Corporation
Defendant: X, Alphabet Inc., Loon LLC, Google LLC and Eric Frische
Not Yet Classified: Hosie Rice LLP
Case Number: 5:2016cv03260
Filed: June 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M Cousins
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Elizabeth D Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 650 NOTICE by Hosie Rice LLP Notice of Lien (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER APPROVING #647 NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL FOR SPACE DATA CORPORATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/8/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 648 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL AT ECF #643 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 647 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #641 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Notice of Refiling of Docs Previously Filed Provisionally Under (ECF 621, 625, 627) Per The Court's Order Granting Joint Sealing Motion (ECF 641) (Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 646 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #645 Notice of Change In Counsel (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Filing 645 NOTICE of Change In Counsel (Proposed)Order by Spencer Hosie (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/7/2019) Modified on 8/7/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2019 Filing 644 REDACTION Refiled Documents Per Court Order ECF #630 by Space Data Corporation. (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 8/5/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 643 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #637 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francesca Miki Shima Germinario, #2 Proposed Order)(Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 2, 2019 Filing 642 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Cristen Liebeler On Behalf of Space Data Corporation (Liebeler, Eric) (Filed on 8/2/2019)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 641 ORDER GRANTING #639 JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/1/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2019)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER GRANTING #638 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT: ECF NO. 635. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/30/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 639 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #621 #625 #627 filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shayne Henry, #2 Declaration of Francesca M. S. Germinario, #3 Proposed Order)(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 638 MOTION Remove Incorrectly Filed Document 635 filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2019. Replies due by 8/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 30, 2019 Filing 637 EXHIBITS re #630 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibit 3 (redacted) to Motion to Quash (originally Dkt. 600-5) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #630 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/30/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 636 REDACTION Refiled Documents at ECF Nos. 581-8; 582-6; 582-10; 582-14; and 582-16 Per Court's Order (ECF No. 617) by Space Data Corporation. (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Filing 635 EXHIBITS re #630 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Exhibit 3 (redacted) to Motion to Quash (originally Dkt. 600-5) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #630 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/29/2019) Modified on 7/29/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT 635 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #640 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/1/2019 (jy, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2019 Filing 634 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Francesca Miki Shima Germinario Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 633 ORDER VACATING TRIAL DATES; REQUESTING STATUS REPORT RE SETTLEMENT OR STIPULATED DISMISSAL ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/29/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2019)
July 26, 2019 Filing 632 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #617 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Notice of Refiling of Documents Previously Filed Provisionally Under Seal Per the Court's Order On Sealing Motions (ECF 617) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Exh 2 to Henry Dec), #2 Exhibit B (Exh 4 to Henry Dec), #3 Exhibit C (Exh 8 to Henry Dec), #4 Exhibit D (Exh 9 to Henry Dec))(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 7/26/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 631 RESPONSE re #623 Brief Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Response to Googles Submission on Interpretation of the NDA by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART SEALING MOTIONS AT ECF #600 AND ECF #612 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/24/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 629 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for Future Trial with Daily Transcripts by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 23, 2019 Motion at ECF #601 resolved by Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas (ECF #627 ). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 628 ORDER RE: REDACTION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENAS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 627 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #601 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENAS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Motions at ECF #556 , #557 , #558 , #559 , #560 resolved by Order re Motions in Limine (ECF #625 ). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER RE: REDACTION OF ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 625 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER RE MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/23/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 624 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shayne Henry, #2 Proposed Order)(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 623 Brief Google's Submission On Interpretation of the NDA filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 622 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Pretrial Conference held on 7/19/2019.Total Time in Court: 2:30. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie, Darrell Atkinson, Francesca Germinario. Defendant Attorney: Robert Van Nest, Matthew Werdegar, Eugene Paige, Matthias Kamber, Ryan Wong, Leah Pransky, Shayne Henry, Andrew Bruns. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/19/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 621 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-19-19, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. (las, ) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 620 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/19/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 22, 2019 Filing 619 ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-19-19, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, Telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/19/2019. (las, ) (Filed on 7/22/2019) Modified on 7/22/2019 (sp, COURT STAFF).
July 22, 2019 Filing 618 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/19/19 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 7/22/2019)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 617 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART SEALING MOTIONS AT ECF #555 AND #581 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/18/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO SEAL AT ECF #565 AND #595 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 615 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Space Data Corporation. Joint [Proposed] Jury Questionnaire, per Court Order ECF #611 . (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 614 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 613 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #601 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6, #5 Exhibit 7, #6 Exhibit 8, #7 Exhibit 9, #8 Exhibit 10, #9 Exhibit 11, #10 Exhibit 12, #11 Exhibit 13, #12 Exhibit 14, #13 Exhibit 15, #14 Exhibit 16, #15 Exhibit 17, #16 Exhibit 18, #17 Exhibit 19, #18 Exhibit 20, #19 Exhibit 21, #20 Exhibit 22)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Filing 612 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francesca Miki Shima Germinario, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 7, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 7, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 8, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 8, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 14, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 14, #13 Redacted Version of Exhibit 16, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #15 Redacted Version of Exhibit 17, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #17 Redacted Version of Exhibit 18, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #19 Redacted Version of Exhibit 19, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #21 Redacted Version of Exhibit 20, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #23 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena, #24 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoena)(Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER DIRECTING THE PARTIES TO FILE A JOINT PROPOSED JURY QUESTIONNAIRE NO LATER THAN JULY 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 610 Response re #600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francesca Miki Shima Germinario, #2 Proposed Order)(Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 609 EXHIBITS Renumbered Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (Exhibit D to ECF #596 ), per Court Order ECF #605 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 608 Proposed Order re #607 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #595 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Parties Joint Submission of Jury Materials Amended Proposed Order by Space Data Corporation. (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 607 EXHIBITS re #595 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Parties Joint Submission of Jury Materials , Renumbered per Court Order #605 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Renumbered Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (Exhibit D to ECF #596 ), #2 Redacted Version of Renumbered Joint Proposed Jury Instructions (Exhibit D to ECF #596 ))(Related document(s) #595 ) (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER RE #593 AND #598 THE PARTIES' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFS CONCERNING THE COURT'S DAUBERT ORDER (ECF #580 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/15/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER INSTRUCTING THE PARTIES TO RE-NUMBER THE PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/12/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 604 ORDER GRANTING #603 STIPULATION SHORTENING TIME ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH TRIAL SUBPOENAS; AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/12/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 603 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shayne Henry ISO Joint Stip and Proposed OST on Defs' Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas)(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 602 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 601 MOTION to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 7/25/2019. Replies due by 8/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Bruns, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Redacted))(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 11, 2019 Filing 600 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to Quash Trial Subpoenas filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Bruns, #2 Motion to Quash (Redacted), #3 Motion to Quash (Unredacted), #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Andrew Bruns, #5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Andrew Bruns (Unredacted), #6 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/11/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 599 Declaration of Andrew S. Bruns in Support of #594 Order In Response to Space Datas Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Briefs in Opposition to Defendants Motions in Limine and Exhibits Thereto filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #594 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 10, 2019 Filing 598 Supplemental Brief re #593 Supplemental Brief, Response to Space Datas Supplemental Brief Identifying Portions of Ingberman Expert Report to Exclude filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #593 ) (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/10/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 597 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #595 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Parties Joint Submission of Jury Materials (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 596 Proposed Jury Instructions by Space Data Corporation JOINT Submission of Jury Materials. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 Plaintiff's Proposed Preliminary Statement, #2 Exhibit A-2 Defendants' Proposed Preliminary Statement, #3 Exhibit B-1 Plaintiff's Proposed Jury Questionnaire, #4 Exhibit B-2 Defendants Proposed Jury Questionnaire, #5 Exhibit C Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions, #6 Exhibit D Joint Proposed Jury Instructions, #7 Exhibit E-1 Plaintiff's Proposed Verdict Form, #8 Exhibit E-2 Defendants Proposed Verdict Form, #9 Exhibit F Defendants' List of Space Data's Asserted Trade Secrets)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 9, 2019 Filing 595 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Parties Joint Submission of Jury Materials filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francesca Miki Shima Germinario, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit F, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit F)(Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/9/2019)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 594 ORDER RE DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF #581 SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/8/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 593 Supplemental Brief re #580 Order on Motion to Strike, Space Data Corporation's Supplemental Brief Identifying Portions of Ingberman's Expert Report to Exclude per Court Order at ECF #580 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #580 ) (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
June 27, 2019 Set Bench Trial: Final Pretrial Conference as to Bench Trial set for 4/16/2020 01:30 PM. Bench Trial set for 5/4/2020, 5/5/2020, 5/6/2020, 5/7/2020, 5/8/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 592 ORDER STAYING ACTION AS TO '706 PATENT; RESETTING BENCH TRIAL ON MAY 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/27/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 591 Supplemental Brief re #579 Order filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #579 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 26, 2019 Filing 590 Supplemental Brief re #579 Order Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Position on Scheduling the '706 Bench Trial filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #579 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/26/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 589 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND EXHIBITS THERETO (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 588 Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Support of Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Oppositions to Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-5 #583 #584 #585 #586 #587 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 10, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 20, #12 Exhibit 21, #13 Exhibit 22, #14 Exhibit 23, #15 Exhibit 24, #16 Exhibit 25, #17 Exhibit 26, #18 Exhibit 27, #19 Exhibit 28, #20 Exhibit 29, #21 Exhibit 30, #22 Exhibit 31, #23 Exhibit 32, #24 Exhibit 33, #25 Exhibit 34, #26 Exhibit 35, #27 Exhibit 36, #28 Exhibit 37, #29 Exhibit 38, #30 Exhibit 39, #31 Exhibit 40)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 587 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #559 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Google's Survey Project ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 586 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #560 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude New Evidence and Theories ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 585 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #558 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Loon and Space Data Valuations and Google's Total Size, Wealth, and Overall Revenues ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 584 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #557 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Allegations of "Missing" Evidence ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 583 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #556 MOTION in Limine 1 Regarding Irrelevant Patent Evidence and Argument ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 582 EXHIBITS re #581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Ex. 10, #2 Unredacted Ex. 12, #3 Redacted Ex. 25, #4 Unredacted Ex. 25, #5 Redacted Ex. 31, #6 Unredacted Ex. 31, #7 Redacted Ex. 32, #8 Unredacted Ex. 32, #9 Redacted Ex. 34, #10 Unredacted Ex. 34, #11 Redacted Ex. 36, #12 Unredacted Ex. 36, #13 Redacted Ex. 37, #14 Unredacted Ex. 37, #15 Redacted Ex. 38, #16 Unredacted Ex. 38, #17 Redacted Ex. 40, #18 Unredacted Ex. 40)(Related document(s) #581 ) (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 581 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITIONS TO DEFENDANTS MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND EXHIBITS THERETO filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Francesca M S Germinario, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 1, #4 Unredacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 1, #5 Redacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 2, #7 Redacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 3, #9 Redacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 4, #10 Unredacted Version of Space Data Corporations Opposition to Defendants Motion in Limine No. 4)(Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER ON DAUBERT MOTIONS (ECF #480 and ECF #484 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/25/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER REQUESTING THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE POSITIONS ON SCHEDULING THE BENCH TRIAL ON THE '706 PATENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/21/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 578 NOTICE of Appearance by Francesca Miki Shima Germinario (Germinario, Francesca Miki Shima) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 577 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTIONS in LIMINE for hearing at Pre-Trial Conference. #556 MOTION in Limine 1 Regarding Irrelevant Patent Evidence and Argument, #559 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Google's Survey Project, #557 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Allegations of "Missing" Evidence, #560 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude New Evidence and Theories, #558 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Loon and Space Data Valuations and Google's Total Size, Wealth, and Overall Revenues set for 7/19/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 20, 2019 Filing 576 Proposed Order re #570 Order Re: Defendants Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Defendants Motions In Limine by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 6/20/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 575 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #555 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 18, 2019 Filing 574 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #565 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Pretrial Statement and Attachments Thereto ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/18/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 573 REDACTION EXHIBITS A, E, AND H TO SPACE DATA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION #539 by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 572 REDACTION Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part and Deferring in Part Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment #524 by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 571 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation Re USB Drive Re Joint Pretrial Statement (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 570 ORDER STRIKING DEFENDANTS' PROPOSED ORDER AT ECF #555 -2. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER GRANTING #564 STIPULATION RE ADMISSION OF EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER GRANTING #563 STIPULATION DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE CERTAIN COUNTERCLAIMS AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 567 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #565 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Pretrial Statement and Attachments Thereto (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 566 Pretrial Conference Statement by Space Data Corporation JOINT Pretrial Statement and Proposed Order. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C-1, #4 Appendix C-2, #5 Appendix C-3, #6 Index D, #7 Index E, #8 Appendix F)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 565 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Pretrial Statement and Attachments Thereto filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Pretrial Statement, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Pretrial Statement, #5 Redacted Version of Appendix C-1, #6 Unredacted Version of Appendix C-1, #7 Redacted Version of Appendix C-2, #8 Unredacted Version of Appendix C-2)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 564 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 563 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Joint) Dismissing Without Prejudice Certain Counterclaims as Moot filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 562 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #555 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 561 Declaration of Shayne Henry in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine Nos. 1-5 filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 560 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude New Evidence and Theories filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 559 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Evidence Regarding Google's Survey Project filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 558 MOTION in Limine No. 3 Regarding Loon and Space Data Valuations and Google's Total Size, Wealth, and Overall Revenues filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 557 MOTION in Limine No. 2 Regarding Allegations of "Missing" Evidence filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 556 MOTION in Limine 1 Regarding Irrelevant Patent Evidence and Argument filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 6/28/2019. Replies due by 7/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 555 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew S. Bruns, #2 Proposed Order, #3 MIL 2 redacted, #4 MIL 2 unredacted, #5 MIL 4 redacted, #6 MIL 4 unredacted, #7 Exhibit 2 Public, #8 Exhibit 2 Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 4 Public, #10 Exhibit 4 Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 6 redacted, #12 Exhibit 6 unredacted, #13 Exhibit 7 redacted, #14 Exhibit 7 unredacted, #15 Exhibit 8 Public, #16 Exhibit 8 Under Seal, #17 Exhibit 9 Public, #18 Exhibit 9 Under Seal)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 554 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Spencer Hosie May 31, 2019 Hearing #548 (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 10, 2019 Filing 553 EXHIBITS re #543 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, REFILED: Exhibits to Space Data Corporation's Daubert Motion, Reply to Defendants' Opposition, and Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Daubert Motion Filings filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #543 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/10/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 552 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #543 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,, of Filing of Redacted Versions of Documents Previously Filed Provisionally Under Seal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Redacted, #2 Exhibit B Redacted, #3 Exhibit C Redacted, #4 Exhibit D Redacted, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F Redacted, #7 Exhibit G Redacted, #8 Exhibit H Redacted, #9 Exhibit I Redacted, #10 Exhibit J Redacted, #11 Exhibit K Redacted)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #538 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/6/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 550 ORDER GRANTING #537 THE PARTIES' REQUEST TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE COURT'S ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/6/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on May 31, 2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 5, 2019 Filing 548 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/31/2019, before Judge Freeman. Court Reporter Irene L. Rodriguez, email address Irene_Rodriguez@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019. (Rodriguez, Irene) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Filing 547 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #541 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Notice of Filing of Redacted Version of Document Previously Filed Provisionally Under Seal (Attachments: #1 REDACTED Expert Report of Robert John Hansman, Ph.D.)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Filing 546 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #538 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Space Data Corporation's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew Bruns in Support of Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiffs Motion to Reconsider, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 545 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/31/19 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Irene Rodriguez. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 5/31/2019)
May 31, 2019 Filing 544 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2019 re #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports filed by Space Data Corporation, #484 MOTION to Strike EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by Google LLC, Loon LLC, Alphabet Inc.A forthcoming Order will memorialize all relevant information, deadlines, and rulings from the hearing. Total Time in Court: 1:02. Court Reporter: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Darrell Atkinson. Defendant Attorney: Mathias Kamber, Matthew Werdegar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2019)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 543 OMNIBUS ORDER RE: THE PARTIES' DAUBERT SEALING MOTIONS AT ECF #479 , #482 , #494 , #497 , AND #519 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/30/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER DENYING #539 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ITS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S GRANT OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO NON-INFRINGEMENT OF THE '193 PATENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/29/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER RE THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE RENEWED MOTIONS TO SEAL AT ECF #530 AND ECF #533 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/29/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 540 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #538 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Space Data Corporation's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 539 MOTION for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration on Non-Infringement of the 193 Patent #524 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Leave, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie in support of Motion for Leave, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 538 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Space Data Corporation's Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ex. A - Motion for Reconsideration, #4 Unredacted Version of Ex. A - Motion for Reconsideration, #5 Redacted Ex. B, #6 Unredacted Ex. B, #7 Redacted Ex. C, #8 Unredacted Ex. C, #9 Redacted Ex. D, #10 Unredacted Ex. D, #11 Redacted Ex. E, #12 Unredacted Ex. E, #13 Redacted Ex. F, #14 Unredacted Ex. F, #15 Redacted Ex. G, #16 Unredacted Ex. G, #17 Redacted Ex. H, #18 Unredacted Ex. H)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 28, 2019 Filing 537 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal PARTIES JOINT SUBMISSION RE SEALING THE COURTS ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT #524 #525 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Declaration of Andrew Bruns, #3 Proposed Order re: Plaintiff's Proposed Redactions, #4 Proposed Order re: Defendants' Proposed Redactions, #5 Redacted Version of Court's Order, #6 Unredacted Version of Court's Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/28/2019)
May 26, 2019 Filing 536 Redaction of #508 Sealed Transcript,, (Related documents(s) #508 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 5/26/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 535 Response re #530 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #411 #416 #517 by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/21/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 14, 2019 Filing 534 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #533 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #439 #517 (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 533 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibits to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment #439 #517 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 135, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 135)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 532 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #530 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #411 #416 #517 (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 531 EXHIBITS 3, 11, 23, 26, and 30 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ #411 #517 filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 11 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #2 Exhibit 23 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #3 Exhibit 26 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #4 Exhibit 30 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 14, 2019 Filing 530 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #411 #416 #517 filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Google's Motion for Summary Judgement, #4 Unredacted Version of Google's Motion for Summary Judgement, #5 Redacted Version of Google's Corrected Motion for Summary Judgement, #6 Unredacted Version of Google's Corrected Motion for Summary Judgement, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibits 2, 12, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 27, 34, 38, 40 to Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar ISO of MSJ, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibits 2, 12, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 27, 34, 35, 38, 40 to Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar ISO of MSJ, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert J. Hansman ISO MSJ, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert J. Hansman ISO MSJ)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 5/14/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 529 EXHIBITS re #517 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, Refiled: Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, and Select Exhibits Thereto (PER COURT ORDER ECF NO. 517) #439 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 44-104, #2 Exhibits 108-196)(Related document(s) #517 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 528 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC of Filing of Redacted Versions of Documents Previously Filed Provisionally Under Seal #467 #517 (Attachments: #1 Reply Brief in Support of Google's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 206 to the Reply Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Filing 527 EXHIBITS re #517 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, re #411 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #517 ) (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS AT ECF #514 AND #516 TO SEAL PORTIONS OF THE APRIL 11, 2019 HEARING TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/10/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER RE: REDACTION OF #524 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/9/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 524 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART AND DEFERRING IN PART #411 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/9/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019)
May 6, 2019 Reset Final Pretrial Conference Hearing re #523 Order Resetting. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 523 ORDER RESETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO JULY 19, 2019, AT 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/6/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
May 6, 2019 Filing 522 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/6/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 521 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 520 REPLY (re #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit 22, #3 Exhibit 23, #4 Exhibit 24, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 28, #7 Exhibit 29, #8 Exhibit 32, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34, #11 Exhibit 35, #12 Exhibit 36, #13 Exhibit 37, #14 Exhibit 38)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 519 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #4 Unredacted Ex. 22, #5 Unredacted Ex. 24, #6 Unredacted Ex. 26, #7 Unredacted Ex. 32, #8 Unredacted Ex. 34, #9 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #10 Redacted Ex. 22, #11 Redacted Ex. 24, #12 Redacted Ex. 26, #13 Redacted Ex. 32, #14 Redacted Ex. 34)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 518 REPLY (re #484 MOTION to Strike EXPERT TESTIMONY ) Reply Brief in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 517 OMNIBUS ORDER ON SEALING MOTIONS AT ECF #415 , #416 , #439 , #466 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/30/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 516 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #508 April 11, 2019 Hearing Transcript filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald M. Knoblach, #2 Declaration of Brandon C. Martin, #3 Proposed Order)(Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 515 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #514 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 514 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bevan A. Dowd in support of Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Document Sought to Be Sealed)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 25, 2019 Filing 513 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript by Diane Sue Rice April 11, 2019 Hearing Transcript (Rice, Diane) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 512 ORDER GRANTING #509 PLAINTIFF SPACE DATA CORPORATION'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS; ECF NOS. 495 AND 500. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/22/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2019)
April 19, 2019 Filing 511 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #497 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gerald M. Knoblach, #2 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/19/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 510 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Google's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 509 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document ; #495 #500 ECF Nos. 495 and 500 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 508 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/11/2019, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, Telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 507 EXHIBITS re #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude CORRECTION OF DOCKET #500 CORRECTED Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #494 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 18, 2019 Filing 506 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #495 Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/18/2019)
April 17, 2019 Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 11, 2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 504 ORDER GRANTING #501 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 503 ORDER GRANTING #492 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO ORDER SEALED TRANSCRIPT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/17/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2019)
April 16, 2019 Reset Motion Hearings as to #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #484 MOTION to Strike EXPERT TESTIMONY. Motion Hearings set for 5/31/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 502 ORDER RESETTING MAY 30, 2019 DAUBERT HEARING TO MAY 31, 2019, AT 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/16/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 501 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document #494 ECF Number 494-4 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/16/2019)
April 16, 2019 Filing 500 Corrected EXHIBIT re #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude CORRECTION OF DOCKET #494 494-4 CORRECTED Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude filed by Space Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #494 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/16/2019) DOCUMENT 500 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #512 (jy, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 500 replaced on 4/23/2019) (jy, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Filing 499 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #497 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 498 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 497 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bevan A. Dowd, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #4 Unredacted Version of Defendants Opposition to Plaintiffs Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #5 Exhibit 4 UNDER SEAL, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 5, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6 UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 9 UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 11 UNDER SEAL, #11 Exhibit 12 UNDER SEAL)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 496 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 15, 2019 Filing 495 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Good DOCUMENT 495 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #512 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/23/2019 (jy, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Filing 494 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #3 Proposed Order, *Ex 4 Removed pursuant to Order #504 . See Dkt #500 for Corrections#4 Redacted Version of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude* #5 Redacted Ex A, #6 Redacted Ex B, #7 Redacted Ex C, #8 Redacted Ex D, #9 Redacted Ex E, #10 Redacted Ex F, #11 Redacted Ex G, #12 Redacted Ex H, #13 Redacted Ex I, #14 Redacted Ex J, #15 Redacted Ex K, #16 Redacted Ex L, #17 Redacted Ex M, #18 Redacted Ex N, #19 Unredacted Version of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Exclude, #20 Unredacted Ex A, #21 Unredacted Ex B, #22 Unredacted Ex C, #23 Unredacted Ex D, #24 Unredacted Ex E, #25 Unredacted Ex F, #26 Unredacted Ex G, #27 Unredacted Ex H, #28 Unredacted Ex I, #29 Unredacted Ex J, #30 Unredacted Ex K, #31 Unredacted Ex L, #32 Unredacted Ex M, #33 Unredacted Ex N)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/15/2019) Modified on 4/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/16/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) 494-4 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #504 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2019 (jy, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 4 replaced on 4/18/2019) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2019 (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/18/2019 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Filing 493 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on April 11, 2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 4/15/2019)
April 12, 2019 Filing 492 First ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Relief to Order the Sealed Transcript from the April 11, 2019 Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Space Data Corporation. Responses due by 4/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 4/12/2019)
April 11, 2019 Filing 491 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2019 re #411 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Google LLC, Loon LLC, Alphabet Inc.Total Time in Court: 1:20. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie, Diane Rice, Brandon Martin, Darrell Atkinson. Defendant Attorney: Robert Van Nest, Matthias Kamber, Leah Pransky, Ryan Wong. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2019) Modified on 4/15/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
April 8, 2019 Filing 490 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation Notice of Withdrawal of Hemant Keeto Sabharwal (Sabharwal, Hemant) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
April 8, 2019 Filing 489 NOTICE by Space Data Corporation of Withdrawal of Hemant Keeto Sabharwal (Sabharwal, Hemant) (Filed on 4/8/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 488 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #482 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 487 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #479 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 486 EXHIBITS re #480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports CORRECTION OF DOCKET #480 Corrected Exhibit 7 to the Hosie Declaration filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 CORRECTED Exhibit 7 to the Hosie Declaration)(Related document(s) #480 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 485 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #482 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 484 MOTION to Strike EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/29/2019. Replies due by 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 483 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #479 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 482 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of Google's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, #4 Unredacted version of Google's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony, #5 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit Redacted version of Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit 10)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 481 Declaration of George Ritchie in Support of #479 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #479 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 480 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports filed by Space Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 4/15/2019. Replies due by 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Support of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #2 Exhibit 1 to the Hosie Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to the Hosie Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to the Hosie Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to the Hosie Declaration, #6 Exhibit 5 to the Hosie Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to the Hosie Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to the Hosie Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to the Hosie Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9 to the Hosie Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10 to the Hosie Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11 to the Hosie Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12 to the Hosie Declaration, #14 Exhibit 13 to the Hosie Declaration, #15 Exhibit 14 to the Hosie Declaration, #16 Exhibit 15 to the Hosie Declaration, #17 Exhibit 16 to the Hosie Declaration, #18 Exhibit 17 to the Hosie Declaration, #19 Exhibit 18 to the Hosie Declaration, #20 Exhibit 19 to the Hosie Declaration, #21 Exhibit 20 to the Hosie Declaration, #22 Exhibit 21 to the Hosie Declaration, #23 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 15, 2019 Filing 479 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #5 Exhibit 1 to the Hosie Declaration, #6 Exhibit 2 to the Hosie Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 to the Hosie Declaration, #8 Exhibit 4 to the Hosie Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8 to the Hosie Declaration, #10 Exhibit 11 to the Hosie Declaration, #11 Exhibit 13 to the Hosie Declaration, #12 Exhibit 14 to the Hosie Declaration, #13 Exhibit 15 to the Hosie Declaration, #14 Exhibit 16 to the Hosie Declaration, #15 Exhibit 17 to the Hosie Declaration, #16 Exhibit 18 to the Hosie Declaration, #17 Exhibit 19 to the Hosie Declaration, #18 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Space Data Corporations Notice of Motion and Daubert Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony and Portions of Related Expert Reports, #19 Exhibit 1 to the Hosie Declaration, #20 Exhibit 2 to the Hosie Declaration, #21 Exhibit 3 to the Hosie Declaration, #22 Exhibit 4 to the Hosie Declaration, #23 Exhibit 8 to the Hosie Declaration, #24 Exhibit 11 to the Hosie Declaration, #25 Exhibit 13 to the Hosie Declaration, #26 Exhibit 14 to the Hosie Declaration, #27 Exhibit 15 to the Hosie Declaration, #28 Exhibit 16 to the Hosie Declaration, #29 Exhibit 17 to the Hosie Declaration, #30 Exhibit 18 to the Hosie Declaration, #31 Exhibit 19 to the Hosie Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 478 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #465 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim , COUNTERCLAIM against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 477 ORDER DENYING #374 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY '706 PATENT PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/12/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 476 EXHIBITS re #467 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #467 ) (Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Filing 475 EXHIBITS re #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #466 ) (Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER GRANTING #473 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/6/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 473 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Dkt Nos. 466-10, 467-8 filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 5, 2019 Filing 472 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Ex A to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Declaration of Gerald M. Knoblach, #3 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/5/2019)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER GRANTING #433 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE PORTIONS OF FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT AND EXHIBITS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/4/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 470 Declaration of ANDREW BRUNS in Support of #469 Response to Motion, filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #469 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 469 Amended RESPONSE (re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/4/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 468 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 3/1/2019)
March 1, 2019 Filing 467 REPLY (re #411 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit 200, #3 Exhibit 201, #4 Exhibit 202, #5 Exhibit 203, #6 Exhibit 204, #7 Exhibit 205,Locked at Filer's Request #8 Exhibit 206, #9 Exhibit 207)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT 467-8 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #474 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2019 (jy, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 466 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion For Summary Judgment, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 200 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 200 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Under Seal Exhibit 202 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #8 Under Seal Exhibit 203 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, #9 Under Seal Exhibit 205 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, Document removed pursuant to Order #474 #10 Redacted Version of Exhibit 206 , #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 206 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Googles Reply Brief ISO Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 3/1/2019) Modified on 3/6/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT 466-10 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #474 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/6/2019 (jy, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/8/2019 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 27, 2019 Filing 465 Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Afirmative Defenses, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Space Data Corporation byLoon LLC, Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 2/27/2019)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 464 ORDER GRANTING #457 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO SPACE DATA'S MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/26/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER GRANTING #459 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/25/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 462 Response re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Andrew Bruns, #2 Proposed Order)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 461 EXHIBITS CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[449-3] filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 460 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [440-5] filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 459 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document: ECF Numbers 440-5 and 449-3 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 22, 2019 Filing 458 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #457 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ) Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Moiton to Extend Time to Respond to Space Data's Motion to Seal filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/22/2019)
February 21, 2019 Filing 457 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Shayne Henry)(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 456 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/19/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 455 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 454 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 150, #2 Exhibit 150)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 453 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 135, #2 Exhibit 135, #3 Exhibit 139, #4 Exhibit 139, #5 Exhibit 144, #6 Exhibit 144, #7 Exhibit 188, #8 Exhibit 188, #9 Exhibit 191, #10 Exhibit 191, #11 Exhibit 195, #12 Exhibit 195)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 452 EXHIBITS re #448 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 157, #2 Exhibit 158, #3 Exhibit 159, #4 Exhibit 160, #5 Exhibit 161, #6 Exhibit 162, #7 Exhibit 163, #8 Exhibit 164, #9 Exhibit 165, #10 Exhibit 166, #11 Exhibit 167, #12 Exhibit 168, #13 Exhibit 169, #14 Exhibit 170, #15 Exhibit 171, #16 Exhibit 172, #17 Exhibit 173, #18 Exhibit 174, #19 Exhibit 175, #20 Exhibit 176, #21 Exhibit 177, #22 Exhibit 178, #23 Exhibit 179, #24 Exhibit 180, #25 Exhibit 181, #26 Exhibit 182, #27 Exhibit 183, #28 Exhibit 184, #29 Exhibit 185, #30 Exhibit 186, #31 Exhibit 187, #32 Exhibit 188, #33 Exhibit 189, #34 Exhibit 190, #35 Exhibit 191, #36 Exhibit 192, #37 Exhibit 193, #38 Exhibit 194, #39 Exhibit 195, #40 Exhibit 196, #41 Exhibit 197, #42 Exhibit 198, #43 Exhibit 199)(Related document(s) #448 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 451 EXHIBITS re #448 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 110, #2 Exhibit 111, #3 Exhibit 112, #4 Exhibit 113, #5 Exhibit 114, #6 Exhibit 115, #7 Exhibit 116, #8 Exhibit 117, #9 Exhibit 118, #10 Exhibit 119, #11 Exhibit 120, #12 Exhibit 121, #13 Exhibit 122, #14 Exhibit 123, #15 Exhibit 124, #16 Exhibit 125, #17 Exhibit 126, #18 Exhibit 127, #19 Exhibit 128, #20 Exhibit 129, #21 Exhibit 130, #22 Exhibit 131, #23 Exhibit 132, #24 Exhibit 133, #25 Exhibit 134, #26 Exhibit 135, #27 Exhibit 136, #28 Exhibit 137, #29 Exhibit 138, #30 Exhibit 139, #31 Exhibit 140, #32 Exhibit 141, #33 Envelope 142, #34 Exhibit 143, #35 Exhibit 144, #36 Exhibit 145, #37 Exhibit 146, #38 Exhibit 147, #39 Exhibit 148, #40 Exhibit 149, #41 Exhibit 150, #42 Exhibit 151, #43 Exhibit 152, #44 Exhibit 153, #45 Exhibit 154, #46 Exhibit 155, #47 Exhibit 156)(Related document(s) #448 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 450 EXHIBITS re #448 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 83, #2 Exhibit 84, #3 Exhibit 85, #4 Exhibit 86, #5 Exhibit 87, #6 Exhibit 88, #7 Exhibit 89, #8 Exhibit 90, #9 Exhibit 91, #10 Exhibit 92, #11 Exhibit 93, #12 Exhibit 94, #13 Exhibit 95, #14 Exhibit 96, #15 Exhibit 97, #16 Exhibit 98, #17 Exhibit 99, #18 Exhibit 100, #19 Exhibit 101, #20 Exhibit 102, #21 Exhibit 103, #22 Exhibit 104, #23 Exhibit 105, #24 Exhibit 106, #25 Exhibit 107, #26 Exhibit 108, #27 Exhibit 109)(Related document(s) #448 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 449 EXHIBITS re #448 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 43,*See dkt #461 for Corrections RE#3 Exhibit 44, #4 Exhibit 45, #5 Exhibit 46, #6 Exhibit 47, #7 Exhibit 48, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50, #10 Exhibit 51, #11 Exhibit 52, #12 Exhibit 53, #13 Exhibit 54, #14 Exhibit 55, #15 Exhibit 56, #16 Exhibit 57, #17 Exhibit 58, #18 Exhibit 59, #19 Exhibit 60, #20 Exhibit 61, #21 Exhibit 62, #22 Exhibit 63, #23 Exhibit 64, #24 Exhibit 65, #25 Exhibit 66, #26 Exhibit 67, #27 Exhibit 68, #28 Exhibit 69, #29 Exhibit 70, #30 Exhibit 71, #31 Exhibit 72, #32 Exhibit 73, #33 Exhibit 74, #34 Exhibit 75, #35 Exhibit 76, #36 Exhibit 77, #37 Exhibit 78, #38 Exhibit 79, #39 Exhibit 80, #40 Exhibit 81, #41 Exhibit 82)(Related document(s) #448 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 2/25/2019) (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 448 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #411 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Pullen ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 A to the Pullen Declaration, #3 B to the Pullen Declaration, #4 C to the Pullen Declaration, #5 Declaration of Gerald M. Knoblach ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #6 Declaration of Francesca Germinario ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #7 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 447 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 176, #2 Exhibit 176, #3 Exhibit 177, #4 Exhibit 177, #5 Exhibit 181, #6 Exhibit 181, #7 Exhibit 183, #8 Exhibit 183, #9 Exhibit 186, #10 Exhibit 186, #11 Exhibit 189, #12 Exhibit 189, #13 Exhibit 190, #14 Exhibit 190, #15 Exhibit 192, #16 Exhibit 192, #17 Exhibit 193, #18 Exhibit 193, #19 Exhibit 196, #20 Exhibit 196, #21 Exhibit 197, #22 Exhibit 197)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 446 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 161, #2 Exhibit 161, #3 Exhibit 162, #4 Exhibit 162, #5 Exhibit 165, #6 Exhibit 165, #7 Exhibit 167, #8 Exhibit 167, #9 Exhibit 170, #10 Exhibit 170, #11 Exhibit 172, #12 Exhibit 172)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 445 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 141, #2 Exhibit 141, #3 Exhibit 142, #4 Exhibit 142, #5 Exhibit 145, #6 Exhibit 145, #7 Exhibit 146, #8 Exhibit 146, #9 Exhibit 147, #10 Exhibit 147, #11 Exhibit 148, #12 Exhibit 148, #13 Exhibit 149, #14 Exhibit 149, #15 Exhibit 151, #16 Exhibit 151, #17 Exhibit 152, #18 Exhibit 152, #19 Exhibit 153, #20 Exhibit 153, #21 Exhibit 154, #22 Exhibit 154, #23 Exhibit 155, #24 Exhibit 155, #25 Exhibit 156, #26 Exhibit 156, #27 Exhibit 157, #28 Exhibit 157, #29 Exhibit 158, #30 Exhibit 158, #31 Exhibit 159, #32 Exhibit 159, #33 Exhibit 160, #34 Exhibit 160)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 444 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 101, #2 Exhibit 101, #3 Exhibit 102, #4 Exhibit 102, #5 Exhibit 103, #6 Exhibit 103, #7 Exhibit 104, #8 Exhibit 104, #9 Exhibit 105, #10 Exhibit 105, #11 Exhibit 106, #12 Exhibit 106, #13 Exhibit 107, #14 Exhibit 107, #15 Exhibit 108, #16 Exhibit 108, #17 Exhibit 109, #18 Exhibit 109, #19 Exhibit 110, #20 Exhibit 110, #21 Exhibit 111, #22 Exhibit 111, #23 Exhibit 112, #24 Exhibit 112, #25 Exhibit 113, #26 Exhibit 113, #27 Exhibit 114, #28 Exhibit 114, #29 Exhibit 126, #30 Exhibit 126, #31 Exhibit 131, #32 Exhibit 131, #33 Exhibit 132, #34 Exhibit 132, #35 Exhibit 133, #36 Exhibit 133, #37 Exhibit 134, #38 Exhibit 134, #39 Exhibit 138, #40 Exhibit 138, #41 Exhibit 140, #42 Exhibit 140)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 443 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 81, #2 Exhibit 81, #3 Exhibit 82, #4 Exhibit 82, #5 Exhibit 83, #6 Exhibit 83, #7 Exhibit 84, #8 Exhibit 84, #9 Exhibit 85, #10 Exhibit 85, #11 Exhibit 86, #12 Exhibit 86, #13 Exhibit 87, #14 Exhibit 87, #15 Exhibit 88, #16 Exhibit 88, #17 Exhibit 90, #18 Exhibit 90, #19 Exhibit 91, #20 Exhibit 91, #21 Exhibit 92, #22 Exhibit 92, #23 Exhibit 93, #24 Exhibit 93, #25 Exhibit 94, #26 Exhibit 94, #27 Exhibit 95, #28 Exhibit 95, #29 Exhibit 96, #30 Exhibit 96, #31 Exhibit 97, #32 Exhibit 97, #33 Exhibit 98, #34 Exhibit 98, #35 Exhibit 99, #36 Exhibit 99, #37 Exhibit 100, #38 Exhibit 100)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 442 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 61, #2 Exhibit 61, #3 Exhibit 62, #4 Exhibit 62, #5 Exhibit 63, #6 Exhibit 63, #7 Exhibit 64, #8 Exhibit 64, #9 Exhibit 65, #10 Exhibit 65, #11 Exhibit 66, #12 Exhibit 66, #13 Exhibit 67, #14 Exhibit 67, #15 Exhibit 68, #16 Exhibit 68, #17 Exhibit 69, #18 Exhibit 69, #19 Exhibit 70, #20 Exhibit 70, #21 Exhibit 71, #22 Exhibit 71, #23 Exhibit 72, #24 Exhibit 72, #25 Exhibit 73, #26 Exhibit 73, #27 Exhibit 74, #28 Exhibit 74, #29 Exhibit 76, #30 Exhibit 76, #31 Exhibit 77, #32 Exhibit 77, #33 Exhibit 78, #34 Exhibit 78, #35 Exhibit 79, #36 Exhibit 79, #37 Exhibit 80, #38 Exhibit 80)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 441 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 51, #2 Exhibit 51, #3 Exhibit 52, #4 Exhibit 52, #5 Exhibit 53, #6 Exhibit 53, #7 Exhibit 54, #8 Exhibit 54, #9 Exhibit 55, #10 Exhibit 55, #11 Exhibit 56, #12 Exhibit 56, #13 Exhibit 57, #14 Exhibit 57, #15 Exhibit 58, #16 Exhibit 58, #17 Exhibit 59, #18 Exhibit 59, #19 Exhibit 60, #20 Exhibit 60)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 440 EXHIBITS re #439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 42, #2 Exhibit 42, #3 Exhibit 43, #4 Exhibit 43, * See dkt #460 for corrections RE#5 Exhibit 44, #6 Exhibit 44, #7 Exhibit 45, #8 Exhibit 45, #9 Exhibit 46, #10 Exhibit 46, #11 Exhibit 47, #12 Exhibit 47, #13 Exhibit 48, #14 Exhibit 48, #15 Exhibit 49, #16 Exhibit 49, #17 Exhibit 50, #18 Exhibit 50)(Related document(s) #439 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/25/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 5 replaced on 2/25/2019) (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 15, 2019 Filing 439 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Filing 438 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER GRANTING #436 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FORTHCOMING MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/15/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2019)
February 14, 2019 Filing 436 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs Forthcoming Motion to Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shayne Henry)(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 2/14/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 435 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 434 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 13, 2019 Filing 433 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portion of Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit H, #8 Unredacted Version of Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 1, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 2, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 3, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 4, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 5, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 1, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 2, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 3, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 4, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 5, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 6, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 7)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/13/2019)
February 1, 2019 Filing 432 EXHIBITS re #423 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, #394 Exhibits, Exhibit 4 to the Hosie Dec ISO Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #423 , #394 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER GRANTING #356 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIFTH AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/1/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2019)
January 31, 2019 Filing 430 STIPULATION re #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment, #415 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Correction of ECF 407] Stipulation Regarding Defendants Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (ECF Nos. 415 & 416) filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/31/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 429 EXHIBITS re #423 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, #403 Reply to Opposition/Response,, filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #423 , #403 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 428 Corrected REPLY (re #374 MOTION to Stay 706 Patent Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review ) #403 #423 filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/29/2019) Modified on 1/30/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2019 Filing 427 EXHIBITS re #379 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #422 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Related document(s) #379 , #422 ) (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/29/2019)
January 29, 2019 Filing 426 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #356 MOTION for Leave to File Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint ) #379 #422 filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 1/29/2019) Modified on 1/30/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 23, 2019 Filing 425 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #374 MOTION to Stay 706 Patent Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review. Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.).(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #413 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MOTION TO STAY HEARING; RESETTING HEARING FOR FEBRUARY 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/23/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 423 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #395 PLAINTIFF'S SEALING MOTION; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #402 DEFENDANTS' SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #378 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/22/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 421 Proposed Order re #420 Opposition/Response to Motion, by Space Data Corporation. (Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 420 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment, #415 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Correction of ECF 407] ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Brandon Martin, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F)(Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 18, 2019 Filing 419 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #413 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Motion to Stay Hearing ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Martin)(Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 418 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/16/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 417 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment [Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment {unredacted/sealed version)] (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 416 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour In Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Corrected Motion for Summary Judgment, #3 Defendants' Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment (REDACTED), #4 Defendants' Corrected Notice of Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment (UNREDACTED))(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 415 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Correction of ECF 407] filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 414 ORDER RESETTING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE TO JULY 16, 2019 AT 1:30 P.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/15/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
January 14, 2019 Filing 413 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Reschedule Motion to Stay Hearing filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah Pransky in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Reschedule Motion to Stay Hearing)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 1/14/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 412 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #407 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Google's Motion For Summary Judgment (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 411 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 2/15/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar, #2 Exhibit 1 - 41 to the Declaration of Matthew Werdegar, #3 Declaration of Robert J. Hansman, #4 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Hansman)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 410 EXHIBITS re #407 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Google's Motion For Summary Judgment [Exhibit 30 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL] filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #2 Exhibit 32 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 33 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #4 Exhibit 34 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #5 Exhibit 35 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #8 Exhibit 38 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 40 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #11 Exhibit 41 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #12 Redacted Version of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Hansman ISO MSJ, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Robert J. Hansman ISO MSJ)(Related document(s) #407 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 409 EXHIBITS re #407 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Google's Motion For Summary Judgment [Redacted Version of Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ] filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #2 Redacted Version of Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 23 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #8 Exhibit 27 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit 28 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) #407 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 408 EXHIBITS re #407 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Regarding Google's Motion For Summary Judgment [Exhibit 11 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL] filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Version of Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #2 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 13 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #5 Exhibit 15 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 17 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #9 Exhibit 19 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit 20 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL)(Related document(s) #407 ) (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/11/2019)
January 11, 2019 Filing 407 *See Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Dkt #415 * Regarding Google's Motion For Summary Judgment filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Google's Motion For Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Google's Motion For Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ - UNDER SEAL, #9 Redacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #11 Redacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO MSJ)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 1/11/2019) Modified on 1/15/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2019 Filing 406 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING as to #356 MOTION for Leave to File Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 2/7/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2019)
December 28, 2018 Filing 405 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #402 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/28/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 404 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #402 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED (Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 403 REPLY (re #374 MOTION to Stay 706 Patent Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review ) CORRECTED Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC and Loon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah Pransky in Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit F, #4 Exhibit G, #5 Exhibit H, #6 Exhibit I, #7 Exhibit J, #8 Exhibit K)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 27, 2018 Filing 402 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTED filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal - CORRECTED, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #3 REDACTED VERSION of Corrected Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC and Loon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Corrected Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC and Loon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Stay, #5 Exhibit F UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit G UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit H UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit I UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit J UNDER SEAL, #10 Exhibit K UNDER SEAL)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/27/2018)
December 26, 2018 Filing 401 *Filing Error See Dkt #404 for Corrections* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #399 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/26/2018) Modified on 12/27/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2018 Filing 400 *Filing Error See Dkt #403 for Corrections* REPLY (re #374 MOTION to Stay 706 Patent Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah Pransky in Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit E to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply, #3 Exhibit F to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply, #4 Exhibit G to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply, #5 Exhibit H to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply, #6 Exhibit I to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply, #7 Exhibit J to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/26/2018) Modified on 12/27/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 26, 2018 Filing 399 *Filing Error See Dkt #402 for Correction* Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal Defendants' Reply to Space Data's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay and Exhibits Thereto, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal, #3 REDACTED VERSION of Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC and Loon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Stay, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC and Loon LLC's Reply to Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Stay, #5 Exhibit F to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply UNDER SEAL, #6 Exhibit G to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply UNDER SEAL, #7 Exhibit H to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply UNDER SEAL, #8 Exhibit I to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply UNDER SEAL, #9 Exhibit J to Pransky Declaration in Support of Defendants' Reply UNDER SEAL)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/26/2018) Modified on 12/27/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2018 Filing 398 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #395 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay and Exhibits thereto ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/21/2018)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER ADVISING THE PARTIES TO REVIEW STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/19/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 396 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #395 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay and Exhibits thereto (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 395 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay and Exhibits thereto filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Declaration of Gerald Knoblach, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of the Opposition to the Motion to Stay, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Unredacted Version of the Opposition to the Motion to Stay, #15 Exhibit 4, #16 Exhibit 6, #17 Exhibit 7, #18 Exhibit 9, #19 Exhibit 10, #20 Exhibit 11, #21 Exhibit 12, #22 Exhibit 13, #23 Exhibit 14)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 19, 2018 Filing 394 EXHIBITS re #393 Opposition/Response to Motion Exhibits 1-16 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 2, #2 3, #3 4, #4 5, #5 6, #6 7, #7 8, #8 9, #9 10, #10 11, #11 12, #12 13, #13 14, #14 15, #15 16)(Related document(s) #393 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/19/2018)
December 18, 2018 Filing 393 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #374 MOTION to Stay 706 Patent Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/18/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 392 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. No. #385 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 391 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. Nos. #364 , #365 , #369 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/17/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. Nos. #364 , #365 , #369 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GOOGLE'S MOTION TO STRIKE; ORDER GRANTING GOOGLE'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL. Re: Dkt. Nos. #364 , #365 , #369 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER AMENDING DECEMBER 11, 2018 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE. Re: Dkt. No. #365 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/13/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 386 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 17, 2018 Filing 385 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah Pransky in Support of Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of December 11 Order, #3 Exhibit REDACTED VERSION of Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit UNREDACTED VERSION of Exhibit A)(Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 12/17/2018)
December 14, 2018 Filing 384 REPLY (re #356 MOTION for Leave to File Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Darrell Atkinson, #2 Exhibit 11, #3 Exhibit 12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 19, #10 Exhibit 20, #11 Exhibit 21, #12 Exhibit 22, #13 Exhibit 23, #14 Exhibit 24, #15 Exhibit 25, #16 Exhibit 26)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 12/14/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 383 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Declaration of George Ritchie, #3 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 11, 2018 Filing 382 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 12/05/18, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number (858) 453-7590. Tape Number: FTR 1:37 - 1:50. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #376 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 1/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2019. (Related documents(s) #376 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018)
December 10, 2018 Filing 381 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/05/18 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 12/10/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 12/10/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 7, 2018 Filing 380 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 379 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #356 MOTION for Leave to File Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber in Support of Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Proposed Order)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 378 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit E to Kamber Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion for Leave to File, #6 Exhibit G to Kamber Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion for Leave to File, #7 Exhibit P to Kamber Declaration in Support of Opposition to Motion for Leave to File)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 12/7/2018)
December 7, 2018 Filing 377 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/5/2018 1:37:03 PM ]. File Size [ 6256 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:13:02 ]. (courtspeak).
December 7, 2018 Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 12/6/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/7/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 12/10/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2018 Filing 375 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Joint Letter Brief #365 and Motion to Seal #369 held on 12/5/2018: Court takes motions under submission. Attorneys for Plaintiff: Brandon Martin, Darrell Atkinson. Attorney for Defendants: Mattias Kamber. (FTR Time: 1:37pm - 1:50pm.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/5/2018)
December 4, 2018 Filing 374 MOTION to Stay 706 Patent Proceedings Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/18/2018. Replies due by 12/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Leah Pransky, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 12/4/2018)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER GRANTING #371 STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/29/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING #355 PLAINTIFFS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. No further action required. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/28/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 28, 2018 Filing 371 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER *Joint Stipulation Extending The Deadline to Depose Defendants' Rebuttal Damages Expert* filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie In Support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending The Deadline to Depose Defendants' Rebuttal Damages Expert)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/28/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 370 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #369 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibits to November 15, 2018 Joint Letter Brief (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 16, 2018 Filing 369 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibits to November 15, 2018 Joint Letter Brief filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit A, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit A, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit C, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 11/16/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 368 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Administrative Motion to file Under Seal #364 and Discovery Letter Brief #365 . Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER JOINT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to November 15, 2018 Letter Brief #363 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 366 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC re #364 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 365 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 11/15/2018).
November 15, 2018 Filing 364 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour in Support of Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief, #2 Proposed Order Regarding Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief, #3 REDACTED VERSION of Joint Letter Brief, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION of Joint Letter Brief)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Filing 363 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to November 15, 2018 Letter Brief filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER GRANTING #361 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018)
November 14, 2018 Filing 361 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #356 MOTION for Leave to File Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, Loon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthias A. Kamber in Support of Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time for Defendants to Oppose Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 360 ORDER GRANTING #359 STIPULATION RE EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/14/2018. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2018)
November 13, 2018 Filing 359 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND CERTAIN EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINE filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew M. Werdegar)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 12, 2018 Filing 358 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Space Data Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/12/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 357 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Space Data Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 356 MOTION for Leave to File Space Data Corporation's Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 355 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Space Data Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Fifth Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit C to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit H to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #8 Unredacted Version of the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 1 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 2 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 3 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 4 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 5 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 1 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 2 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 3 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 4 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 5 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 6 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 7 to the Proposed Fifth Amended Complaint)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
October 4, 2018 Filing 354 NOTICE by Space Data Corporation of Withdrawal of Lyndsey C. Heaton as Counsel for Plaintiff Space Data Corporation (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 10/4/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 353 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM #351 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,628,941; 9,632,503; 9,643,706; 9,678,193. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/6/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 6, 2018 Filing 351 ANSWER to Amended Complaint (Fourth), COUNTERCLAIM against Space Data Corporation byLoon LLC, Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 4, 2018 Filing 350 Redaction of #335 Transcript,,, (Related documents(s) #335 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 9/4/2018)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 349 ORDER GRANTING #343 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/31/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018)
August 27, 2018 Filing 348 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and Select Exhibits thereto ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER GRANTING #346 STIPULATION TO CHANGE CASE CAPTION TO REFLECT THE ADDITION OF LOON LLC AS A DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/27/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018)
August 24, 2018 Filing 346 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING CHANGE OF CASE CAPTION TO REFLECT THE ADDITION OF LOON LLC AS A DEFENDANT filed by Space Data Corporation. (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 8/24/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 345 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and Select Exhibits thereto (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 344 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Fourth Amended Complaint against Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. Filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to FAC, #2 Exhibit B to FAC, #3 Exhibit C to FAC, #4 Exhibit D to FAC, #5 Exhibit E to FAC, #6 Exhibit F to FAC, #7 Exhibit G to FAC, #8 Exhibit H to FAC)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 343 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint and Select Exhibits thereto filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Fourth Amended Complaint, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit C to Fourth Amended Complaint, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to Fourth Amended Complaint, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit H to Fourth Amended Complaint, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 1 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 2 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 3 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 4 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 5 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 1 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 2 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 3 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 4 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 5 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 6 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 7 to the Fourth Amended Complaint, #21 Unredacted Version of Fourth Amended Complaint)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 22, 2018 Filing 342 RESPONSE to re #337 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Joint Letter Brief re Motion to Compel Thrun Testimony, Redacted and Filed Per Court Order by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER GRANTING #339 STIPULATION TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER GRANTING #338 STIPULATION TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING LOON LLC AS DEFENDANT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/17/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 17, 2018 Filing 339 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND EXPERT DISCOVERY DEADLINES filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ryan K. Wong)(Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 8/17/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 338 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT ADDING LOON LLC AS DEFENDANT filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 337 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART SPACE DATA'S AUGUST 8, 2018 MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Re: ECF #323 . By August 22, Space Data must publicly file a copy of the letter brief containing only the redactions approved in this order. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 336 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Motion to Compel Thrun ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of its Joint Letter Brief Re: Thrun)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 13, 2018 Filing 335 Transcript of Proceedings held on August 8, 2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #329 Transcript Order, #328 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 9/4/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/13/2018. (Related documents(s) #329 , #328 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 8/13/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 334 ORDER SEALING Portions of the Transcript from the Discovery Hearing on August 8, 2018 [330-3]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/10/2018. (cc: Transcriber Joan Columbini). (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 333 Letter from Space Data Corporation Regarding Copy of U.S. Patent Appl. No. 09/342,440. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [330-2]. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER REGARDING U.S. PATENT APPL. NO. 09/342,440. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/10/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 330 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Stipulation Regarding the August 8, 2018 Discovery Hearing Transcript filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Chester Day in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #3 Proposed Order Sealing Portions of the Transcript From the Discovery Hearing on August 8, 2018, #4 Redacted Version of Stipulation Regarding Sealing Portions of the Transcript From the Discovery Hearing on August 8, 2018, #5 Unredacted Version of Stipulation Regarding Sealing Portions of the Transcript From the Discovery Hearing on August 8, 2018)(Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 329 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 08/08/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Wong, Ryan) (Filed on 8/10/2018)
August 10, 2018 Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 8/8/18 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 8/10/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST to Compel Discovery from Witness Sebastian Thrun. Re: ECF #324 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 326 RESPONSE to re #319 Brief, #305 Order Plaintiff's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief re Claim 28 of the '503 Patent by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 325 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Motion to Compel Thrun (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 324 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Motion to Compel Thrun filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 323 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Motion to Compel Thrun filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re: Motion to Compel Thrun, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re: Motion to Compel Thrun)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/8/2018)
August 8, 2018 Filing 322 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/8/2018 11:28:08 AM ]. File Size [ 904 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:53 ]. (courtspeak).
August 8, 2018 Filing 321 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/8/2018 11:08:54 AM ]. File Size [ 8864 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:18:28 ]. (courtspeak).
August 8, 2018 Filing 320 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis #311 held on 8/8/2018: Plaintiff's motion to compel further documents and deposition re witness Michael Collins denied for the reasons stated on the record. If there is a motion to seal any portion of the hearing transcript, it must be filed by August 10. Attorney for Plaintiff: Lyndsey Heaton. Attorney for Defendants Alphabet Inc., Google LLC: Ryan Wong. (FTR Time: 11:08am -= 11:30am.) Attachment: Minute order. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/8/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 319 Brief Defendants' Supplemental Claim Construction Brief re Claim 28 of the '503 Patent filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 318 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief re: Certain Claim Construction Terms filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 7, 2018 Filing 317 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Regarding Claim Term Constructions filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 8/7/2018)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL #310 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018)
August 3, 2018 Filing 315 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER GRANTING #309 STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/2/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 1, 2018 Filing 313 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis #311 . Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 312 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 311 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 310 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re: Collins Analysis)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 31, 2018 Filing 309 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Motion to Compel Deadline filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton In Support Of Stipulation Re: Motion to Compel Deadline)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/31/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 308 Letter Brief re #300 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: The 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #300 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 30, 2018 Filing 307 Letter Brief re #300 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,,,,,,,, Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: The Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #300 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/30/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 306 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/27/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #304 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/25/2018. (Related documents(s) #304 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER REGARDING JULY 27, 2018 CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/27/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 304 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/27/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 303 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 7/27/18 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/27/2018)
July 27, 2018 Filing 302 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Claims Construction Hearing held on 7/27/2018. Time in Court: 2 hours, 39 minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Courtroom Deputy: Irene Mason. For Plaintiff(s): Brandon Cody Martin, Spencer Hosie, Darrell Rae Atkinson, and Diane Sue Rice. For Defendant(s): Robert Addy Van Nest, Shayne Hunter Henry, Andrew Stephen Bruns, and Matthias Andreas Kamber. For transcript requests please see: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov/transcripts#ORDERING (This is a text only Minute Entry; there is no document associated with this entry) (iym, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/27/2018)
July 25, 2018 Filing 301 CLERK'S NOTICE: Parties reported by email that the discovery dispute is resolved, Dkt. No. #277 ; the hearing set for 7/27/2018 at 01:00 PM before Judge Cousins is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2018)
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER RE: SEALING MOTIONS. Re: ECF: #268 , #273 , #276 , #278 , #283 . By 7/30, the parties must publicly file the portions of the letter brief at ECF #268 for which sealing was denied, and the entirety of the letter brief at ECF #273 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins granting in part and denying in part #268 . (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 299 Brief re #291 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, #250 Brief,,, Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opening Claim Construction Brief-Redacted Version filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #291 , #250 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/20/2018)
July 20, 2018 Filing 298 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Claims Tutorial Hearing held on 7/20/2018.Total Time in Court: 1:45. Court Reporter: Off Record Tutorial. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie, Diane Rice, Brandon Martin. Defendant Attorney: Matthias Kamber. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/20/2018)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 297 ORDER GRANTING #296 STIPULATION RE: USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AT THE CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/19/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2018)
July 18, 2018 Filing 296 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: USE OF ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT AT THE CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND HEARING filed by Space Data Corporation. (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER RE: GOOGLE'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ABOUT FINANCIAL INTERESTS OF PLAINTIFF'S WITNESSES. Re: ECF #284 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS ABOUT "COMPARABLE TECHNOLOGIES". Re: ECF #279 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER PRIVILEGE LOG. Re: ECF #277 . The Court will hold a hearing on 7/27/2018 at 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 7/17/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER RE: GOOGLE 30(B)(6) DEPOSITION. Re: ECF #274 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2018)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S SEALING MOTION AT ECF #249 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/16/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 290 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief ) Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Response Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5(e)(1) in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jerry Knoblach in Support of Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Response Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5(e)(1) in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions Joint Letter Brief)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 289 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re Comparable Technologies ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 288 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 287 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re Google's Privilege Log ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew Bruns, #2 Proposed Order)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER GRANTING #280 STIPULATION REGARDING DEADLINE FOR MOTIONS TO COMPEL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/9/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 285 Discovery Letter Brief- Certificate of Service filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 284 Discovery Letter Brief Regarding Space Data Witnesses' Personal Financial Interest in Litigation Outcome filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 283 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Letter Brief, #4 Letter Brief to be sealed)(Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 282 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re Comparable Technologies (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 281 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re Google's Privilege Log (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 280 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Deadline for Filing Motions to Compel filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton ISO Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 279 Letter Brief re Comparable Technologies filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/6/2018).
July 6, 2018 Filing 278 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re Comparable Technologies filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re: Comparable Techologies, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief re: Comparable Technologies)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 277 Letter Brief re: Google's Privilege Log filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Joint Letter Brief re Google's Privilege Log, #2 Exhibit A to Hosie Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/6/2018).
July 6, 2018 Filing 276 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re Google's Privilege Log filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Hosie Declaration ISO Joint Letter Brief re Google's Privilege Log)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 275 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 274 Letter Brief Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 273 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson, #2 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson, #3 Redacted Version of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson, #4 Unredacted Version of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the 30(b)(6) Deposition of Michael Pearson)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
July 2, 2018 Filing 272 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #268 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/2/2018)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER RE: THRUN DEPOSITION. Re: Dkt. No. #269 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 270 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #268 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 269 Joint Discovery Letter BriefRe: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sebastian Thrun ISO Motion to Quash and for Protective Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 28, 2018 Filing 268 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of the Joint Letter Brief Re: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Diane S. Rice ISO Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of the JOint Letter Brief Re: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief Re: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief Re: the Subpoena of Nonparty Sebastian Thrun)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/28/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 267 Brief re #250 Brief,,, Claim Construction Reply Brief filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sam Pullen ISO Space Data's Claim Construction Reply Brief, #2 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton ISO Space Data's Claim Construction Reply Brief, #3 Exhibit 1 to Heaton Decl., #4 Exhibit 2 to Heaton Decl., #5 Exhibit 3 to Heaton Decl., #6 Exhibit 4 to Heaton Decl.)(Related document(s) #250 ) (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER GRANTING #265 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM CONSTRUCTION REPLY BRIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/21/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 21, 2018 Filing 265 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Claim Construction Reply Brief filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Support of Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Time to File Plaintiff's Claim Construction Reply Brief)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE ON LITIGATION FUNDING. RE: ECF #259 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 263 Response Defendants' Responsive Claim Construction Brief byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Leah Pransky, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Declaration of Robert John Hansman, #10 Exhibit A, #11 Exhibit B, #12 Exhibit C, #13 Exhibit D, #14 Exhibit E, #15 Exhibit F, #16 Exhibit G)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief #258 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 29, 2018 Filing 261 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Portions of Joint Letter Brief filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 5/29/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 260 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Privilege #259 and Administrative Motion to Seal #258 . Motion Hearing set for 6/13/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 24, 2018 Filing 259 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Privilege filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
May 23, 2018 Filing 258 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted version of letter brief, #4 Unredacted version of letter brief)(Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 5/23/2018)
May 21, 2018 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 5/17/18 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 5/21/2018)
May 19, 2018 Filing 256 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/17/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #254 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/17/2018. (Related documents(s) #254 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 5/19/2018)
May 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER DENYING #190 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/18/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 254 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/17/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/17/2018)
May 17, 2018 Filing 253 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 5/17/2018. Written Order to be Issued as Stated on the Record. Total Time in Court: 12 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie. Defendant Attorney: Leah Pransky, Matthias Kamper. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/17/2018)
May 15, 2018 Filing 252 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) Defendants Response to Plaintiff Space Datas Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Its Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 5/15/2018)
May 12, 2018 Filing 251 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/12/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 250 Brief re #249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Samuel Pullen ISO Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie Plaintiff's Opening Claim Construction Brief, #3 Exhibit Ex. 1, #4 Exhibit Ex. 2, #5 Exhibit Ex. 3, #6 Exhibit Ex. 4, #7 Exhibit Ex. 5, #8 Exhibit Ex. 6, #9 Exhibit Ex. 7, #10 Exhibit Ex. 8, #11 Exhibit Ex. 9, #12 Exhibit Ex. 10, #13 Exhibit Ex.11, #14 Exhibit Ex.12, #15 Exhibit Ex.13, #16 Exhibit Ex.14, #17 Exhibit Ex.15, #18 Exhibit Ex.16, #19 Exhibit Ex.17, #20 Exhibit Ex.18, #21 Exhibit Ex.19, #22 Exhibit Ex.20, #23 Exhibit Ex.21, #24 Exhibit Ex.22, #25 Exhibit Ex.23, #26 Exhibit Ex.24, #27 Exhibit Ex.25, #28 Exhibit Ex.26)(Related document(s) #249 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 249 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brandon Martin ISO of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL REVISED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Re: ECF #235 , #236 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER RE: REDACTED ORDER. Re: ECF #245 . The clerk of court is directed to file the redacted version of the order ECF [245-1], as an order of the Court with a new ECF number. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/8/2018. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2018)
May 4, 2018 Filing 246 Mail sent to Matthew Mickle Werdegar returned marked as Moved re #244 Document Sealed. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2018)
May 1, 2018 Filing 245 RESPONSE to re #244 Document Sealed, Joint Letter Re: Redactions to Judge Cousins' April 24, 2018 Order by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Redacted Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/1/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL REVISED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Re: ECF #235 , #236 . This order is provisionally filed under seal. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 4/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Space Data's Fourth Amended Sec. 2019 Trade Secret Disclosure and Exhibits #235 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 242 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM of Defendants Alphabet Inc. and Google LLC bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 20, 2018 Filing 241 CLERK'S NOTICE VACATING the hearing set for 4/25/2018 01:00 PM re: Discovery Letter Brief re: Space Data's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Trade Secret Disclosure #236 . The Court finds the dispute suitable for decision without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2018)
April 19, 2018 Filing 240 NOTICE of Appearance by Shayne Hunter Henry and Ryan Wong (Henry, Shayne) (Filed on 4/19/2018)
March 30, 2018 Filing 239 AMENDED ANSWER to Third #144 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Space Data Corporation byGoogle LLC, Alphabet Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 3/30/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 238 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING RE: Discovery Letter Brief re: Space Data's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Trade Secret Disclosure #235 , and Administrative Motion to File Under Seal #236 . Hearing set for 4/25/2018 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 7, 4th Floor before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 237 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Space Data's Fourth Amended Sec. 2019 Trade Secret Disclosure (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 236 Discovery Letter Briefre: Space Data's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Trade Secret Disclosure filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton in Support of Joint Letter Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 to Heaton Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Heaton Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Heaton Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Heaton Declaration)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 235 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Joint Letter Brief re: Space Data's Fourth Amended Sec. 2019 Trade Secret Disclosure filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief, #4 Redacted Version of Ex. 1 to Heaton Decl ISO Joint Letter Brief, #5 Redacted Version of Ex. 2 to Heaton Decl ISO Joint Letter Brief, #6 Redacted Version of Ex. 3 to Heaton Decl ISO Joint Letter Brief, #7 Redacted Version of Ex. 4 to Heaton Decl ISO Joint Letter Brief, #8 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief, #9 Unredacted Version of Ex. 1 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #10 Unredacted Version of Ex. 2 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #11 Unredacted Version of Ex. 3 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #12 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, Part 1 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #13 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, Part 2 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #14 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, Part 3 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #15 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, Part 4 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #16 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, Part 5 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #17 Unredacted Version of Ex. 4, Part 6 to Heaton Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 23, 2018 Hearings Set re #147 Order on Stipulation, Tutorial Hearing set for 7/20/2018 09:00 AM, Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/27/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 234 Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Support of #233 Reply to Opposition/Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 38, #2 Exhibit 39, #3 Exhibit 40, #4 Exhibit 41, #5 Exhibit 42, #6 Exhibit 43, #7 Exhibit 44, #8 Exhibit 45, #9 Exhibit 46, #10 Exhibit 47, #11 Exhibit 48, #12 Exhibit 49, #13 Exhibit 50, #14 Exhibit 51, #15 Exhibit 52, #16 Exhibit 53, #17 Exhibit 54, #18 Exhibit 55, #19 Exhibit 56, #20 Exhibit 57, #21 Exhibit 58, #22 Exhibit 59, #23 Exhibit 60, #24 Exhibit 61, #25 Exhibit 62, #26 Exhibit 63, #27 Exhibit 64, #28 Exhibit 65, #29 Exhibit 66, #30 Exhibit 67, #31 Exhibit 68, #32 Exhibit 69, #33 Exhibit 70, #34 Exhibit 71, #35 Exhibit 72, #36 Exhibit 73, #37 Exhibit 74, #38 Exhibit 75, #39 Exhibit 76, #40 Exhibit 77)(Related document(s) #233 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 15, 2018 Filing 233 REPLY (re #190 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #185 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/15/2018)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER GRANTING #231 STIPULATION RE: DEFENDANTS' AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/8/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2018)
March 7, 2018 Filing 231 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Defendants' Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Counterclaims to Space Data's Third Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton In Support of Stipulation)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Space Data's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement #222 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
March 2, 2018 Filing 229 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Hosie of Brandon C. Martin (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/2/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL AT ECF #205 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/27/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER GRANTING #189 MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/26/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 23, 2018 Filing 226 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/23/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 225 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #190 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #185 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication ) Defendants Alphabet Inc. and Google LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff Space Data's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Leah Pransky, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 224 RESPONSE to re #210 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 223 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 14, 2018 Filing 222 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement, #4 Unredacted Version of Ex. A, Part 1 to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement, #5 Unredacted Version of Ex. A, Part 2 to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement, #6 Unredacted Version of Ex. A, Part 3 to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement, #7 Unredacted Version of Ex. A, Part 4 to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement, #8 Unredacted Version of Ex. A, Part 5 to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement, #9 Unredacted Version of Exs. B-F to Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Section 2019.210 Statement)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/14/2018)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Re: ECF #196 , #211 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER GRANTING #219 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S DAMAGES CONTENTIONS AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSIVE DAMAGES CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 219 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re Extending Time for Damages Disclosures filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton In Support Of Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Extending Time for Damages Disclosures)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER GRANTING #214 STIPULATION TO EXTEND PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/5/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Re: Discovery of Emails #213 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information #212 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 215 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #211 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joint Letter Brief re: Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 214 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Plaintiff's Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Defendants' Counterclaims filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton In Support of Stipulated Request to Change Time)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 213 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Emails filed by Space Data Corporation. (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 212 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information filed by Space Data Corporation. (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Filing 211 Amended Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of the Parties' Joint Letter Brief re: Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie in Support of Amended Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER DENYING #206 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/1/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 209 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton in Support of #206 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge CORRECTION OF DOCKET #207 filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #206 ) (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 208 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Heaton Declaration In Support Of Motion for Relief (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 207 *See Doc #209 for corrected Declaration only of Lyndsey C. Heaton* in Support of #206 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit B to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief Remove, #3 Exhibit C to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief)(Related document(s) #206 ) (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/30/2018) Modified on 1/31/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2018 Filing 206 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Space Data Corporation. Responses due by 2/13/2018. Replies due by 2/20/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton In Support of Motion for Relief, #2 Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 30, 2018 Filing 205 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to Heaton Declaration In Support Of Motion for Relief filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie in Support of Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, #4 Redacted Version of Ex. B to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, #5 Unredacted Version of Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 1, #6 Unredacted Version Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 2, #7 Unredacted Version Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 3, #8 Unredacted Version Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 4, #9 Unredacted Version Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 5, #10 Unredacted Version Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 6, #11 Unredacted Version Ex. A to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief, Part 7, #12 Unredacted Version of Ex. B to Heaton Declaration ISO Motion for Relief)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/30/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #197 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/29/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING #188 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENT ECF #185 . Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/29/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2018)
January 25, 2018 Filing 202 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/10/2018, before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #186 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 2/15/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/26/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/25/2018. (Related documents(s) #186 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER GRANTING #200 STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY ADJUDICATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/24/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 24, 2018 Filing 200 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending the Briefing Schedule for Space Data's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar in Support of Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending the Briefing Schedule for Space Data's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 199 RESPONSE to January 11, 2018 Order by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Redacted Version of Jan. 11, 2018 Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 198 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 1 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 197 MOTION for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed by Space Data Corporation. Responses due by 2/6/2018. Replies due by 2/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 23, 2018 Filing 196 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibit 1 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton in Support of Administrative Motion to seal, #2 Exhibit A to Heaton Declaration, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 1/23/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 195 Answer to Amended Complaint #144 Amended Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Google LLC, Alphabet Inc. byGoogle LLC, Alphabet Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 194 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation re Extension of Deadlines Set By Jan. 11, 2018 Order #192 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 192 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order re Extension of Deadlines Set By Jan. 11, 2018 Order filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 17, 2018 Filing 191 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 190 MOTION for Summary Judgment CORRECTION OF DOCKET #185 Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication filed by Space Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 1/25/2018. Replies due by 2/1/2018. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 189 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 188 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document , Docket No. #185 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie In Support of Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document, #2 Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/16/2018)
January 16, 2018 Filing 187 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/10/2018 before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/16/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 1/16/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2018 Filing 186 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/13/2018)(TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 1/14/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2018 Filing 185 *** MAIN DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR WITH CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** MOTION for Summary Judgment *Plaintiff Space Data's Motion for Partial Summary Adjudication* filed by Space Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 1/25/2018. Replies due by 2/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27, #29 Exhibit 28, #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33, #35 Exhibit 34, #36 Exhibit 35, #37 Exhibit 36, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 1/11/2018) Modified on 1/16/2018 (fff, COURT STAFF). DOCUMENT(S) 185 REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #203 Modified on 1/30/2018 (jy, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2018 Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement #179 held on 1/10/2018: Court to issue (sealed) order granting motion and setting schedule. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Spencer Hosie, Diane Rice. Defendants' Attorney: Matthew Werdegar. (FTR Time: 10:04am - 10:23am.) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2018)
December 26, 2017 Filing 182 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING Re Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement #179 . Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2017)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING #177 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/20/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 12/20/2017)
December 20, 2017 Filing 179 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Werdegar ISO Defendants' Position in Joint Letter Brief Regarding the Deficiencies of Space Data's Third Amended Section 2019.210 Trade Secret Disclosure, #2 Exhibit 1 to Werdegar Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Werdegar Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Werdegar Declaration, #5 Exhibit 4 to Werdegar Declarationn, #6 Exhibit 5 to Werdegar Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6 to Werdegar Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7 to Werdegar Declaration, #9 Declaration of Spencer Hosie ISO Joint Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement, #10 Exhibit A to Hosie Declaration, #11 Exhibit B to Hosie Declaration, #12 Exhibit C to Hosie Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 12/20/2017) Modified on 1/11/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2017 Filing 178 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re Plaintiff's Section 2019.210 Statement filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Joint Letter Brief, #4 Unredacted Version of Joint Letter Brief, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 1 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 2 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 3 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 4 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 5 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 6 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, Part 7 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 3 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 4 to Werdegar Decl. ISO Joint Letter Brief)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 12/20/2017) Modified on 1/11/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
December 19, 2017 Filing 177 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #176 Order on Motion to Dismiss filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/19/2017)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING #159 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/18/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2017)
December 7, 2017 Claims Tutorial and Construction Hearing set for 7/20/2018 09:00 AM. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2017)
December 5, 2017 Filing 175 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/30/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #173 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2018. (Related documents(s) #173 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 174 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/30/2017 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 173 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/30/17 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 11/30/2017)
November 30, 2017 Filing 172 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2017 re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' otion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Google LLC, Alphabet Inc. Total Time in Court: 26 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie, Diane Rice. Defendant Attorney: Matthew Werdegar. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2017)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIUPLATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 10/19/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 19, 2017 Filing 170 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order filed by Alphabet Inc., Google LLC. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/19/2017)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING #167 STIPULATION TO REFLECT NAME CHANGE FROM GOOGLE INC. TO GOOGLE LLC. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/3/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 168 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. Supplemental (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
October 2, 2017 Filing 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Reflect Name Change from Google Inc. to Google LLC filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 10/2/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 166 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Dkt. No. 165* filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #160 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/25/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2017)
September 22, 2017 Filing 164 REPLY (re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 9/22/2017)
September 19, 2017 Filing 163 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Compl Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Compl Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Compl ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Portions of Exhibit 1 Thereto, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of its Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint and Portions of Exhibit 1 Thereto)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 9/19/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 162 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Compl Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Compl Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Compl (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 161 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #159 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint* filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Decl. of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
September 13, 2017 Filing 160 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Motion for Administrative Relief to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint and Portions of Exhibit 1 Thereto* filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Declaration of Darrell Atkinson, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Opposition to Motion to Dismiss TAC, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit 1 to Hosie Decl., #6 Unredacted Opposition to Motion to Dismiss TAC, #7 Exhibit Unredacted Exhibit 1 to Hosie Decl.)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 9/13/2017)
August 16, 2017 Filing 159 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/13/2017. Replies due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 9, 2017 Filing 158 STIPULATION Re: Space Datas Future Use of Elliott Drucker in Consulting Capacity filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 8/9/2017)
August 3, 2017 Filing 157 REDACTION to #156 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Revised Redacted Version of Plaintiff Space Data's Third Amended Complaint pursuant to #156 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to TAC, #2 Exhibit B to TAC, #3 Exhibit C to TAC, #4 Exhibit D to TAC, #5 Exhibit E to TAC, #6 Exhibit F to TAC, #7 Exhibit G to TAC, #8 Exhibit H to TAC)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #143 SEALING MOTION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/31/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
July 28, 2017 Filing 155 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rosa Yaghmour, #2 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/28/2017)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING #153 STIPULATION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/27/2017. Close of Fact Discovery due by 6/29/2018. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/27/2017: #1 Appendix) (blflc4, COURT STAFF).
July 26, 2017 Filing 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #147 Order on Stipulation, Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order re Case Schedule filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 26, 2017 Filing 152 STIPULATION re #144 Amended Complaint, Stipulation Modifying Briefing Schedule For Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER GRANTING #149 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATA'S MOTION TO SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT AND THE ENTIRETY OF CERTAIN EXHIBITS THERETO. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/25/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
July 24, 2017 Set/Reset Hearing Dates re #147 Order on Stipulation, Claims Construction Tutorial set for 7/20/2018 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/27/2018 09:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 4/11/2019 09:00 AM. Daubert Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 01:30 PM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2019 1:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 8/2/2019, 8/5/2019 09:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 8/5/2019, 8/6/2019, 8/7/2019, 8/8/2019, 8/9/2019, 8/12/2019, 8/13/2019, 8/14/2019, 8/15/2019 and 8/16/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 150 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) #148 filed byAlphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 149 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 Filing 148 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint ) Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Administrative Relief To File Under Seal Portions Of Its third Amended Complaint And The Entirety of Certain Exhibits Thereto filed byAlphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER RE #146 STIPULATION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/24/2017. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/27/2018 09:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. Tutorial Hearing set for 7/20/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 146 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Schedule filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 145 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint, #144 Amended Complaint, (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 144 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff Space Data's Third Amended Complaint against Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. Filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to TAC, #2 Exhibit B to TAC, #3 Exhibit C to TAC, #4 Exhibit D to TAC, #5 Exhibit E to TAC, #6 Exhibit F to TAC, #7 Exhibit G to TAC, #8 Exhibit H to TAC)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 20, 2017 Filing 143 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Declaration of Darrell Atkinson In Support of Motion to Seal, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Redacted Version of Third Amended Complaint, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit C to Third Amended Complaint, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to Third Amended Complaint, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit H to Third Amended Complaint, #8 Unredacted Version of Third Amended Complaint, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 1 to Third Amended Complaint, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 2 to Third Amended Complaint, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 3 to Third Amended Complaint, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 4 to Third Amended Complaint, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 5 to Third Amended Complaint, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D Part 1 to Third Amended Complaint, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 1 to Third Amended Complaint, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 2 to Third Amended Complaint, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 3 to Third Amended Complaint, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 4 to Third Amended Complaint, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 5 to Third Amended Complaint, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 6 to Third Amended Complaint, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit H Part 7 to Third Amended Complaint)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 7/20/2017)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 142 OMNIBUS ORDER RE #88 MOTION TO DISMISS, #79 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND, #77 MOTION TO CHANGE DEADLINE TO AMEND PLEADINGS, AND #117 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/14/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
July 12, 2017 Filing 141 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 7, 2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina Galvan Colin, telephone number 408-888-6697. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #139 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 8/2/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/10/2017. (Related documents(s) #139 ) (ggc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 139 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Georgina Colin. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 7, 2017 Filing 138 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/06/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., for Court Reporter Georgina Colin. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/7/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 7/6/2017 re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Google Inc., Alphabet Inc., #79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. Total Time in Court: 47 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Gina Colin. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie, Diane Rice. Defendant Attorney: Matthew Werdegar, Matthias Kamber. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/6/2017)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING #130 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/5/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 136 Transcript of Proceedings held on 06/29/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #134 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2017. (Related documents(s) #134 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 135 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Stephen Bruns (Bruns, Andrew) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 30, 2017 Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/29/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/30/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 133 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Hearing held on 6/29/2017. Total Time in Court: 21 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Spencer Hosie, Diane Rice. Defendant Attorney: Mathias Kamber. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/29/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 132 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibits 1 and 2 to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief re Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint, #131 Supplemental Brief, Exhibits 1 and 2 (Unredacted Versions) (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 131 Supplemental Brief re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief, #2 Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Brief)(Related document(s) #79 ) (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 130 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Exhibits 1 and 2 to Plaintiff's Supplemental Brief re Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend (TAC and Exhibits), #4 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend (Redline of TAC), #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 2, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 3, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 4, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 5, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 6, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 7, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 8, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2 to Supplemental Brief Re Motion for Leave to Amend (Redline of TAC))(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 27, 2017 Filing 129 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #117 MOTION from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 111 Motion Hearing,,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, ) Space Data's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Relief from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie in Support of Opposition to Motion for Relief, #2 Exhibit A to Hosie Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER GRANTING #127 STIPULATION REGARDING DATE FOR EXCHANGE OF PROPOSED CLAIM TERMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
June 23, 2017 Filing 127 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Date for Exchange of Proposed Claim Terms Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-1 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 23, 2017 Set Hearing as to #117 MOTION from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 111 Motion Hearing, Order on Discovery Letter Brief . Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. The Parties may appear by Courtcall without further order of the court. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2017)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER REQUIRING RESPONSE TO #117 DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM NONDISPOSITIVE PRETRIAL ORDER BY JUNE 28, 2017 AND SETTING HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/22/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 125 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 21, 2017, before Judge Nathanael Cousins. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number (510) 367-3043, joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #121 Transcript Order, #123 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 7/13/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/24/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/20/2017. (Related documents(s) #121 , #123 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Discovery Letter Briefs #118 #120 held on 6/21/2017: Plaintiff's discovery request for immediate remedy against defendants for their non-compliance with Court's May 31 order denied, in light of defendant's timely and procedurally proper objection to the trial judge under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. The Court encourages the parties to confer further as to stipulations to request modest modifications of the case schedule in light of defendants' deferred production of one category of materials under PLR 3-4(a). Plaintiff's Attorneys: Lyndsey Heaton, Darrell Atkinson. Defendants' Attorneys: Robert Van Nest, Matthias Kimber. (FTR Time 2:04pm to 2:15pm.) This is a text-only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/21/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 123 TRANSCRIPT ORDER before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 21, 2017 Filing 122 DISREGARD AND SEE DOCKET ENTRY 124. Modified on 6/21/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2017 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on June 21, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 6/21/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2017 Filing 120 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthias A. Kamber, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Errata D)(Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 6/21/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 119 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING re Discovery Letter Brief #118 for 6/21/2017 at 2:00 PM. Defendants' response (no more than 3 pages) due by noon tomorrow. Counsel must contact the Courtroom Deputy at 408.535.5343 to provide a direct dial number. Counsel must be available beginning at 2:00 PM until called by the Court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 20, 2017 Filing 118 Letter from Plaintiff Space Data re Order on Production of Documents under PLR 3-4 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
June 9, 2017 Filing 117 MOTION from Nondispositive Pretrial Order of Magistrate Judge re 111 Motion Hearing,,, Order on Discovery Letter Brief,, filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X. Responses due by 6/23/2017. Replies due by 6/30/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/9/2017)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING #109 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/7/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 5, 2017 Filing 115 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) *Plaintiff Space Data Corporation's Response Pursuant to Civil L.R. 79-5(e)(1) in Support of Defendants' Request to File Documents Under Seal* filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie, #2 Proposed Order)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 3, 2017 Filing 114 Transcript of Proceedings of the official sound recording held on 05/31/17, before Magistrate Judge Nathanael Cousins. FTR/Transcriber Echo Reporting, Inc., telephone number 8584537590. Tape Number: FTR. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #112 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/1/2017. (Related documents(s) #112 ) (tgb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2017) (TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 6/2/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2017 Filing 112 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 6/1/2017)(TRANSCRIBER: ECHO REPORTING) Modified on 6/2/2017 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2017 Filing 111 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Hearing re Joint Discovery Letter Brief #105 held on 5/31/2017: For the reasons stated on the record, the Court DENIED defendants' request to stay discovery of core technical documents under Patent Local Rule 3-4(a), for lack of good cause shown. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Lyndsey Heaton, Darrell Atkinson. Defendants' Attorney: Matthew Werdegar. (FTR Time 1:06pm - 1:27pm.) This is a text-only Minute Entry. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/1/2017).
June 1, 2017 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. re #109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 109 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply ISO Motion To Dismiss, #4 UnRedacted Version of Reply ISO Motion To Dismiss)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 6/1/2017)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING #102 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/30/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 26, 2017 Filing 107 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HEARING re Joint Discovery Letter Brief #105 . Hearing set for 5/31/2017 01:00 PM in Courtroom 7, 4th Floor, San Jose before Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2017)
May 25, 2017 Filing 106 STATUS REPORT Amended Status Report Regarding Pending Patents by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Amended Status Report Regarding Pending Patents)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 24, 2017 Filing 105 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #6 Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #8 Exhibit B to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #9 Exhibit C to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #10 Exhibit D to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #11 Exhibit E to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #12 Exhibit F to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton, #13 Exhibit G to Declaration of Lyndsey C. Heaton)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/24/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #103 Opposition/Response to Motion,, #102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Certificate of Service of Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 103 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ) Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Spencer Hosie In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss SAC, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Spencer Hosie In Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss SAC)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 102 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Portions of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss SAC, #4 Unredacted Version of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss SAC)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING #100 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' INVALIDITYCONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/19/2017.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2017)
May 19, 2017 Filing 100 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time for Defendants' Invalidity Contentions filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. Space Data Corporation. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/19/2017) Modified on 5/19/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2017 Filing 99 Space Data Corporation's Status Report Regarding Issuance of Pending Patents by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/17/2017) Modified on 5/18/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER GRANTING #95 MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/17/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER GRANTING #87 MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/16/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2017)
May 15, 2017 Filing 96 RESPONSE PURSUANT TO CIVIL L.R. 79-5(e)(1) IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL (re #87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie ISO Administrative Motion to Seal, #2 (Proposed) Order re Administrative Motion to Seal) (Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 5/15/2017) Modified on 5/16/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 95 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO REMOVE INCORRECTLY FILED DOCUMENTS; DOCKET NUMBERS #74 -3, #75 , #78 -3, and #79 -1 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents, #2 (Proposed) Order Granting Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Text modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 94 EXHIBIT 1: Third Amended Complaint and Exhibits A, B, C and D REDACTED VERIONS OF DOCUMENT(S) SOUGHT TO BE SEALED re #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Space Data Corporation. (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 93 EXHIBITS: Redacted Version of Second Amended Complaint re #74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal CORRECTION OF DOCKET # [74-3] filed by Space Data Corporation. (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 92 EXHIBITS 1: re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint (CORRECTION OF DOCKET #79 -1]) filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 91 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT CORRECTION OF DOCKET #75 against Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. Filed by Space Data Corporation. (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 90 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie, #2 Exhibit A to Hosie Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Hosie Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Hosie Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Hosie Decl., #6 Exhibit E to Hosie Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Hosie Declaration.)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 12, 2017 Filing 89 PROOF OF SERVICE re #88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/12/2017) Modified on 5/15/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 11, 2017 Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/25/2017. Replies due by 6/1/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 11, 2017 Filing 87 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit 3 Unredacted Version, #3 Exhibit 7 Unredacted Version, #4 Exhibit 3 Redacted Version, #5 Exhibit 7 Redacted Version, #6 Redacted Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #7 Uredacted Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, #8 Proposed Order)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 5/11/2017)
May 8, 2017 Filing 86 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (re #79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christa M. Anderson, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 (Proposed) Order)(Anderson, Christa) (Filed on 5/8/2017) Modified on 5/9/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING #78 , #81 MOTIONS TO SEAL AND TERMINATING #74 MOTION AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/1/2017.(blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2017)
April 28, 2017 Filing 84 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATA'S CORRECTED MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF ITS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CERTAIN EXHIBITS THERETO (re #81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 Filing 83 RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATA'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO FILE UNDER SEAL PORTIONS OF EXHIBIT 1 TO ITS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT (re #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2017 Filing 82 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATAS MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CHANGE TIME (re #77 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 4/28/2017) Modified on 5/1/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2017 Filing 81 Corrected Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re #74 filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Correction of Docket # [74-1] Declaration of G. Ritchie ISO Motion to Seal SAC, #2 Correction of Docket # [74-2] (Proposed) Order)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 4/25/2017) Modified on 4/26/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 25, 2017 Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used of Exhibits when filing Certificate of Service re #80 . Clerk made corrections, no further action required filed by Space Data Corporation (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2017)
April 24, 2017 Set Hearing as to #79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)
April 24, 2017 Filing 80 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE EXHIBIT 1 TO PLAINTIFF SPACE DATA CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, UNREDACTED re #78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Related document(s) #78 ) (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 4/24/2017) Text modified on 4/25/2017 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: *** #1 Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to File TAC DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #98 *** , #2 Proposed Order, #3 Declaration of Spencer Hosie In Support of Motion for Leave to File TAC, #4 Exhibit A to Hosie Declaration, #5 Exhibit B to Hosie Declaration, #6 Exhibit C to Hosie Declaration, #7 Exhibit D to Hosie Declaration, #8 Exhibit E to Hosie Declaration, #9 Exhibit F to Hosie Declaration, #10 Exhibit G to Hosie Declaration, #11 Exhibit H to Hosie Declaration, #12 Exhibit I to Hosie Declaration)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/24/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/18/2017) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/18/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2017 Filing 78 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie In Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, *** #3 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #98 *** , #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 1, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 2, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 3, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 4, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 5, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 6, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1 to Motion for Leave to Amend - Part 7)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 4/24/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/18/2017) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/18/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2017 Filing 77 MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF TO CHANGE TIME filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Spencer Hosie In Support of Motion to Change Time, #2 Exhibit A to Hosie Declaration, #3 (Proposed) Order)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/24/2017) Text modified on 4/25/2017 conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2017 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE PLAINTIFF SPACE DATA CORPORATIONS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (INCLUSIVE OF EXHIBITS) UNREDACTED re #74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proof of Service of Unredacted Version of SAC and Exhibits filed by Space Data Corporation. (Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 4/20/2017) Text modified on 4/21/2017 (conforming to posted document caption (bwS, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2017 Filing 75 *** DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #98 *** SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PATENT INFRINGEMENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. 1 et seq. (941 Patent); 2. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS UNDER 18 U.S.C. 1836 & 1837; 3. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS UNDER CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 3426, et seq.; and 4. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. Filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to SAC, #2 Exhibit B to SAC, #3 Exhibit C to SAC, #4 Exhibit D to SAC)(Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 4/20/2017) Modified on 4/21/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/12/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/18/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Main Document 75 replaced on 5/18/2017) (sp, COURT STAFF).
April 20, 2017 Filing 74 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of George Ritchie ISO Motion to Seal, #2 Proposed Order, *** #3 Redacted Version of Second Amended Complaint DOCUMENT REMOVED PURSUANT TO ORDER #98 *** , #4 Exhibit A to SAC, #5 Exhibit B to SAC, #6 Redacted Version of Exhibit C to SAC, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit D to SAC, #8 Unredacted Version of Second Amended Complaint, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 1, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 2, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 3, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 4, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit C Part 5, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit D)(Atkinson, Darrell) (Filed on 4/20/2017) Modified on 5/12/2017 (ewn, COURT STAFF). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/18/2017) (sp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/18/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2017 Reset Hearings re #73 Order on Stipulation. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/16/2018 09:00 AM. Tutorial Hearing set for 3/9/2018 09:00 AM. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING #72 STIPULATION REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/20/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Case Schedule filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Heaton, Lyndsey) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 14, 2017 Filing 71 NOTICE by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. Notice Of Firm Name and Email Address Change (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 3/14/2017)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER APPROVING #69 SPACE DAT A CORPORATION'S NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/9/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 7, 2017 Filing 69 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Spencer Hosie (Hosie, Spencer) (Filed on 3/7/2017) Modified on 3/8/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2017 Filing 68 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/16/2017, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #62 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/25/2017. (Related documents(s) #62 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 65 Case Management Conference. Claims Tutorial Hearing set for 7/17/2017 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/28/2017 09:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions Hearing set for 1/10/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 02/21/2017. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER MODIFYING DATE OF TUTORIAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/21/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 63 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 62 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 2/17/2017)
February 17, 2017 Filing 61 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOC #62 ***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 02/16/2017 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 2/17/2017) Modified on 2/27/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 17, 2017 Filing 60 ***FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOC #63 ***TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/16/17 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 2/17/2017) Modified on 2/27/2017 (sp, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2017 Filing 65 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/16/2017.Total Time in Court: 26 minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Colin Kemp, Kirke Hasson. Defendant Attorney: Matthew Werdegar, Christa Anderson. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/16/2017)
February 16, 2017 Filing 64 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 2/16/2017 re #46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Google Inc., Alphabet Inc. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss with Leave to Amend. Amended Complaint due 03/20/2017.Total Time in Court: 32 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Colin Kemp, Kirke Hasson. Defendant Attorney: Matthew Werdegar, Christa Anderson. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 2/16/2017)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #46 MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/16/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2017)
February 9, 2017 Filing 58 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. 35 (10/27/16 Joint CMC Statement), #2 Exhibit Notice of Allowance)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING #53 DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 2, 2017 Filing 56 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #53 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Colin T. Kemp, #2 Declaration of Gerald Knoblach)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 30, 2017 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc. re #53 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 Filing 54 REPLY (re #46 MOTION to Dismiss ) filed byAlphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 30, 2017 Filing 53 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Werdegar, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, #4 Unredacted Version of Reply In Support of Defendants' Motion To Dismiss, #5 Redacted Version of Exhibit 1, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 1, #7 Redacted Version of Exhibit 2, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 2, #9 Under Seal Exhibit 3)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 1/30/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 1/12/2017)
January 12, 2017 Filing 51 NOTICE of Service of Space Data's CCP Section 2019.210 Identification of Trade Secrets by Space Data Corporation (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2017 Filing 50 OPPOSITION TO GOOGLES MOTION TO DISMISS (re #46 MOTION to Dismiss , Declaration of Colin T. Kemp (with Exhibits) filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration (with Exhibits)) (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 1/12/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #48 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND IN OPPOSITION TO GOOGLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/6/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2017) Modified on 1/9/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2017 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #46 MOTION to Dismiss for Order to Extend Time to Respond in Opposition filed by Space Data Corporation. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 1/6/2017)
December 2, 2016 Filing 47 Proposed Order re #46 MOTION to Dismiss by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
December 2, 2016 Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 2/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/16/2016. Replies due by 12/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING #43 STIPULATION RE CASE SCHEDULE AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/22/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 22, 2016 Filing 44 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held on 11/22/2016 with Howard Herman. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
November 22, 2016 Filing 43 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #41 Order,,, Set Hearings,,, Set Deadlines,, filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 16, 2016 Filing 42 ADR Clerk's Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on Tuesday, November 22, 2016, at 2:00 PM Pacific time. Please note that you must be logged into an ECF account of counsel of record in order to view this document. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 40 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/03/2016 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 11/10/2016) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/10/2016 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2016 Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-03-2016 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Space Data Corporation, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 10, 2016 Filing 38 STIPULATION TO MODIFY BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR RULE 12 MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc.. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
November 7, 2016 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/03/2016 before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman by Google Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 11/7/2016) (TRANSCRIBER: JOAN COLUMBINI) Modified on 11/7/2016 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER re 36 Case Management Conference - Initial, Case Management Statement due 02/09/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/16/2017 11:00 AM. Motion to Dismiss Hearing reserved for 02/16/2017 at 9:00 AM. Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 02/14/2019 at 9:00 AM. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 6/3/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 6/3/2019, 6/4/2019, 6/5/2019, 6/6/2019, 6/7/2019, 6/10/2019, 6/11/2019, 6/12/2019, 6/13/2019 and 6/14/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Case Management Statement due by 2/9/2017. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/03/2016. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
November 3, 2016 Filing 36 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/3/2016.FTR Time: 11:02 - 11:22. Plaintiff Attorney: Kirke Hasson, H. Keeto Sabharwal, Colin Kemp. Defendant Attorney: Robert Van Nest, Chester Day. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2016)
October 27, 2016 Filing 35 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Case Schedules)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 10/27/2016)
October 26, 2016 Filing 34 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Dismiss filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 10/26/2016)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER SELECTING ADR PROCESS (granting #32 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/24/2016.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Space Data Corporation filed by Space Data Corporation. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options filed by Plaintiff (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 30 Certificate of Interested Entities by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
October 13, 2016 Filing 29 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 28 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 9/30/2016) Modified on 10/3/2016 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2016 Filing 27 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/27/2016. Case Management Conference set for 11/03/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2016)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #23 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/29/2016.(blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2016)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 7/26/16. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 26, 2016 Filing 24 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 26, 2016 Filing 23 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Hemant Keeto Sabharwal ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-10637297.) filed by Space Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 7/26/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #1 Complaint,, Served on Google Inc. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #1 Complaint,, Served on Defendant Alphabet Inc. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Space Data Corporation re #1 Complaint,, Served on Defendant X (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Leah Maxx Pransky On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Pransky, Leah) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Edward Gorman On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Gorman, Thomas) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthias Andreas Kamber On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Kamber, Matthias) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Morris Paige On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Paige, Eugene) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mickle Werdegar On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Werdegar, Matthew) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christa M. Anderson On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Anderson, Christa) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 13 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint filed by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 12 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X.. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 21, 2016 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Addy Van Nest On Behalf Of Defendants X, Alphabet Inc., and Google Inc. (Van Nest, Robert) (Filed on 7/21/2016)
July 7, 2016 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Space Data Corporation.. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 7/7/2016)
June 28, 2016 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Alphabet Inc., Google Inc., X. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2016)
June 27, 2016 Filing 8 Proposed Summons. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 27, 2016 Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #7 Proposed Summons filed by Space Data Corporation. Attachment was e-filed in a Read Only Mode. Attachment must be e-filed correctly in order to issue summons. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2016)
June 24, 2016 Filing 7 Proposed Summons. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 6/24/2016)
June 23, 2016 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination. Plaintiff Space Data Corporation shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 7/7/2016. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The consent/declination forms are attached to this Notice and are also located on the Court's home page, www.cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2016)
June 16, 2016 Filing 5 Certificate of Interested Entities by Space Data Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Gerald Knoblach, Other Affiliate Marcellus Knoblach, Other Affiliate Eric Frische for Space Data Corporation. (Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 6/16/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding:PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/6/2016. Case Management Conference set for 9/13/2016 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/14/16. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 14, 2016 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. by 6/28/2016. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2016)
June 13, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR: 1. PATENT INFRINGEMENT UNDER 35 U.S.C. 1 et seq.; 2. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS UNDER 18 U.S.C. 1836; 3. MISAPPROPRIATION OF TRADE SECRETS UNDER CALIFORNIA CIVIL CODE 3426, et seq.; and 4. BREACH OF WRITTEN CONTRACT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED; (NO PROCESS) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10525972.). Filed bySpace Data Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Errata F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kemp, Colin) (Filed on 6/13/2016) Modified on 6/14/2016 (aaaS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Space Data Corporation v. Alphabet Inc.,Google LLC, and Loon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Space Data Corporation
Represented By: Hemant Keeto Sabharwal
Represented By: Lyndsey C. Heaton
Represented By: Diane Sue Rice
Represented By: Darrell Rae Atkinson
Represented By: David Nicholas Patariu
Represented By: Kirke M. Hasson
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Represented By: Francesca Miki Shima Germinario
Represented By: Eric Cristen Liebeler
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Colin T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X
Represented By: Matthias Andreas Kamber
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Represented By: Leah Maxx Pransky
Represented By: Eugene Morris Paige
Represented By: Christa M. Anderson
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alphabet Inc.
Represented By: Matthias Andreas Kamber
Represented By: Ryan K.M. Wong
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Bruns
Represented By: Leah Maxx Pransky
Represented By: Eugene Morris Paige
Represented By: Christa M. Anderson
Represented By: Shayne Hunter Henry
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loon LLC
Represented By: Matthias Andreas Kamber
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Bruns
Represented By: Leah Maxx Pransky
Represented By: Shayne Hunter Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Represented By: Matthias Andreas Kamber
Represented By: Ryan K.M. Wong
Represented By: Robert Addy Van Nest
Represented By: Matthew Mickle Werdegar
Represented By: Andrew Stephen Bruns
Represented By: Leah Maxx Pransky
Represented By: Eugene Morris Paige
Represented By: Christa M. Anderson
Represented By: Shayne Hunter Henry
Represented By: Thomas Edward Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Frische
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Hosie Rice LLP
Represented By: Spencer Hosie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?