Capelli Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Capelli Enterprises, Inc., Nameer Jalel and Aseel Issa
Defendant: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation and Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv03401
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss the Action or, in the Alternative, to Stay the Action Pending Arbitration. The hearing scheduled for 1/17/2017 is VACATED. This action is STAYED in its entirety pending the final resolution of the arbitration. The Clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this file. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/13/2017. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2017)
August 26, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/26/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2016)
August 17, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. If Plaintiffs do not, by 8/19/2016, file a written response that demonstrates the basis for this court's subject matter jurisdiction, the court will dismiss this action without prejudice. No hearing will be held on the Order to Show Cause unless ordered by the court. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/17/2016. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capelli Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capelli Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Alan Eisenhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nameer Jalel
Represented By: Marc Alan Eisenhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aseel Issa
Represented By: Marc Alan Eisenhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantastic Sams Salons Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fantastic Sams Franchise Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?