Straight Path IP Group, Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Straight Path IP Group, Inc.
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv03463
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 19, 2017 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler re 61 Discovery Letter Brief. (lblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2017)
February 8, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 23 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY WAYNE STACY PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2017)
January 24, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 29 Stipulated Protective Order Regarding the Disclosure and use of Discovery Materials. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2017)
July 13, 2016 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH PATENT LOCAL RULE 2-1(A). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/13/2016. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straight Path IP Group, Inc. v. Cisco Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Straight Path IP Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Jeffrey Zhi Yang Liao
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Andrew D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cisco Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah JoAnn Guske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?