Mariano et al v. Villa et al

Plaintiff: Cirina Justo Mariano, A C G and A D G
Defendant: Enrique Valencia Villa, Arturo Villa and Rigoberto Villa
Case Number: 5:2016cv03467
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiffs against Enrique Villa. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/27/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
June 20, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 50 PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/20/2017. The 6/22/2017 hearing is vacated. No appearance necessary. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2017)
January 19, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY) - SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFIC DEADLINES: The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 1/26/2017 is VACATED - NO APPERANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the order. Joint Final Pretrial Conference Statement due 6/29/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/13/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 7/25/2017 09:00 AM, Jury Trial 7/25/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial dates: 7/26, 7/28, 8/1, 8/2/2017(Deliberations). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/19/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mariano et al v. Villa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enrique Valencia Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arturo Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rigoberto Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cirina Justo Mariano
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Ko-Fang Chang
Represented By: Maighna Jain
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Jon Michaelson
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A C G
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Ko-Fang Chang
Represented By: Maighna Jain
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Jon Michaelson
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A D G
Represented By: Nadia Aziz
Represented By: Ko-Fang Chang
Represented By: Maighna Jain
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Jon Michaelson
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?