Straight Path IP Group, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.

Plaintiff: Straight Path IP Group, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv03582
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 13, 2017 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 69 MOTION TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2017)
April 4, 2017 75 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE 69 MOTION TO LIMIT THE NUMBER OF ASSERTED CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 4/4/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2017)
March 9, 2017 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/9/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
January 23, 2017 66 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER (pursuant to 64 stipulation) by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
December 6, 2016 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 62 MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
October 21, 2016 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE APPLE'S MOTION TO DISMISS INDUCEMENT CLAIM by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 44 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2016)
September 30, 2016 54 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE RE OPPORTUNITIES FOR YOUNG ATTORNEYS. Signed by Judge Alsup on 9/30/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 18, 2016 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT by Hon. William Alsup finding as moot 26 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 15, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST FOR RESPONSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/15/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2016)
August 12, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY C. MATTHEW ROZIER PRO HAC VICE by Hon. William Alsup granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Straight Path IP Group, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Straight Path IP Group, Inc.
Represented By: Marc Aaron Fenster
Represented By: Paul Anthony Kroeger
Represented By: Neil Alan Rubin
Represented By: Andrew D. Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Minchener Jalali
Represented By: Clayton Cole James
Represented By: Srecko Vidmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?