Cox v. Dental and Medical Department of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation

Plaintiff: Bobby Joe Cox
Defendant: Dental and Medical Department of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 5:2016cv04036
Filed: July 19, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: PSLC HHL
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/22/18. (Certificate of Service Attached). (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018)
July 18, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO APPOINT COUNSEL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Certificate of Service Attached). (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2018)
June 15, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER REMAND. Amended complaint or objections to the order of dismissal to be filed by 7/16/2018. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/15/18. (Certificate of Service Attached). (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2018)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Dental and Medical Department of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Joe Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dental and Medical Department of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?