Mitravich v. Ally Financial Inc.

Plaintiff: Julie Mitravich
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04072
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 1, 2018 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. THE CLERK SHALL CLOSE THE FILE. All deadlines/hearings are terminated. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/1/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2018)
June 7, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SETTLEMENT. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2018 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 7/23/2018. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/7/2018. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
May 24, 2018 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Discovery Hearing re 57 plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order. Telephonic hearing set for 5/30/2018, 11:00 AM. Counsel to arrange for appearance via CourtCall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/24/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2018)
February 10, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 31 (MODIFIED BY THE COURT). Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/10/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitravich v. Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Mitravich
Represented By: Joshua Charles Anaya
Represented By: Sharon Elizabeth Glassey
Represented By: Christopher T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Represented By: Mary Catherine Kamka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?