Adobe Systems Incorporated v. A & S Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Defendant: A & S Electronics, Inc., Spot.Me Products LLC, Alan Z. Lin, Budget Computer, Computechsale, LLC, Expresscomm International Inc., Fairtrade Corporation, FCO Electronic, ITR Consulting Group, LLC, Reliable Business Partner, Inc. and Lester Wiegers
Case Number: 5:2016cv04144
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2017. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on May 25, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Permanent Injunction Against Computechsale, LLC and for Dismissal Solely Thereof filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on February 21, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2017)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Entry of Permanent Injunction Against Defendants A&S Electronics, Inc., Spot.Me Products LLC, and Alan Z. Lin filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 28, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 51 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Entry of Permanent Injunction Against Lester Wiegers, DBA Ultraelectronics, and for Dismissal Solely Thereof filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 21, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 48 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Entry of Permanent Injunction Against ITR Consulting Group, LLC, and for Dismissal Solely Thereof filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 15, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Entry of Permanent Injunction Against Fairtrade Corporation and for Dismissal Solely Thereof filed by Adobe Systems Incorporated. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 3, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adobe Systems Incorporated v. A & S Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adobe Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Marcus Freeman Chaney
Represented By: Christopher Quang Pham
Represented By: Jason Robert Vener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & S Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spot.Me Products LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Z. Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Budget Computer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Computechsale, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expresscomm International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairtrade Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCO Electronic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITR Consulting Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliable Business Partner, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lester Wiegers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?