Rabieh v. Paragon Systems inc.
Plaintiff: Raad Zuhair Rabieh
Defendant: Paragon Systems Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04256
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SUA SPONTE Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases 19-cv-00944 NC and 16-cv-04256 EJD. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 2/21/2019. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2019)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi re 85 Stipulation for Department of Homeland Security/Federal Protective Service Documents and Witnesses. (vkdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2018)
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER GRANTING 74 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/11/2018. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2018)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting 66 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The hearing scheduled for 4/12/2018 is VACATED. Plaintiff shall file the proposed second amended complaint as a separate docket entry on ECF forthwith. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 4/9/2018. (ejdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE WITH MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND REFERRING CASE TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/21/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/15/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2017) Modified text on 9/15/2017 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 47 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/8/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2017)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING 43 MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE. Counsel shall contact Courtcall directly to arrange for appearance. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/21/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2017) Modified text on 6/21/2017 (amkS, COURT STAFF).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rabieh v. Paragon Systems inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paragon Systems Inc.
Represented By: Carol A Humiston, Humis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raad Zuhair Rabieh
Represented By: Che Lewellyn Hashim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?