Citixsys Americas, Inc. v. Vend Limited et al

Plaintiff: Citixsys Americas, Inc.
Defendant: Vend Limited and Vend, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04263
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 9, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2017)
November 30, 2016 44 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERRAL. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Amended Pleadings due by 1/29/2017; Close of Fact Discovery due by 7/16/2017; Designation of Experts due by 8/1/2017; Rebuttal Reports due by 9/1/2017; Close of Exp ert Discovery due by 10/1/2017; Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2017 02:00 PM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/2/2018 03:00 PM; Jury Selection / Jury Trial (5-day)set for 1/22/2018 08:30 AM before Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 11/30/2016. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2016)
November 22, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 38 Motion to Appear by Telephone at Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
November 17, 2016 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. granting 34 Motion to Appear by Telephone for Plaintiff's Lead Counsel to Appear Telephonically At Case Management Conference. Counsel shall contact CourtCall at (866) 582-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
November 10, 2016 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 28 Leave To File First Amended Complaint. Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2016.. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2016)
August 10, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 17 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Victoria R. Danta. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
August 5, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice For Marcella Ballard. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citixsys Americas, Inc. v. Vend Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vend Limited
Represented By: Jason Matthew Joyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vend, Inc.
Represented By: Jason Matthew Joyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Citixsys Americas, Inc.
Represented By: Marcella Ballard
Represented By: Victoria R Danta
Represented By: Robert Leslie Meyerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?