National Medical Services, Inc. dba NMS Labs v. INDX Lifecare, Inc.

Plaintiff: National Medical Services, Inc.
Defendant: INDX Lifecare, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04425
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of National Medical Services, Inc. against iNDx Lifecare, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/10/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2017)
May 30, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DEFENDANT INDX'S CITIZENSHIP. Re: Dkt. No. 15 . The Court ORDERS NMS to file a declaration supporting NMS's assertion of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction by 6/6/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/30/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
May 8, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ATTORNEYS' FEES. Re: Dkt. No. 15 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/8/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2017)
March 27, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. No. 15 . National Medical to file with the Court a brief not to exceed 10 pages addressing each of the seven Eitel factors by 4/5/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/27/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Medical Services, Inc. dba NMS Labs v. INDX Lifecare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Medical Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Sendaula Sepuya
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDX Lifecare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?