Ismael Jimenez et al v. David Y Tsai et al

Plaintiff: Ismael Jimenez, Yolanda Jimenez, Angeles Jimenez, Antonio Jimenez, Carmentina Herrera, Luis Alvarez, Ebaristo Alavez, Josefa Jimenez, Jesucita Ortiz, Rodolfo Robles and Project Sentinel
Defendant: David Y Tsai, Undine Tsai and Tzean Shen
Case Number: 5:2016cv04434
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2017 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re 70 Discovery Dispute Joint Report No. 1. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2017)
July 25, 2017 69 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY): The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 7/27/2017 is VACATED and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the Order. Dispositive Motion due by 2/1/2018. Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 5/10/201 8 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 5/17/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/31/2018 11:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 6/12/2018 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 6/ 12/2018 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Edward J. Davila. Jury Trial dates:6/13/2018 09:00 AM, 6/15 09:00 AM, 6/19 09:00 AM, 6/20 09:00 AM, 6/22/2018 09:00 AM, 6/26 09:00 AM, 6/27 09:00 AM, 6/29 09:00 AM (deliberations). Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/25/2017. (amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 5, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 40 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Any amended complaint shall be filed no later than 7/7/2017. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 6/5/2017. (ejdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ismael Jimenez et al v. David Y Tsai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Y Tsai
Represented By: Paul Andre Desrochers
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Undine Tsai
Represented By: Paul Andre Desrochers
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tzean Shen
Represented By: Paul Andre Desrochers
Represented By: Elizabeth Marie Dooley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ismael Jimenez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yolanda Jimenez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angeles Jimenez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Jimenez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmentina Herrera
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alvarez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ebaristo Alavez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josefa Jimenez
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesucita Ortiz
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodolfo Robles
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Sentinel
Represented By: Diana Elizabeth Castillo
Represented By: Andrew Max Goldberg
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Kyra Ann Kazantzis
Represented By: Annette D. Kirkham
Represented By: Dalia Beth Kothari
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Thomas Philip Zito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?