Sunil Kumaran Vethody et al v. National Default Services Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sunil Kumaran Vethody and Bindu Baburajan Vethody
Defendant: National Default Services Corporation and Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv04713
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. 4/2/2019 Show Cause Hearing is VACATED. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 3/27/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2019)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re SETTLEMENT. Stipulated dismissal due by 3/19/2019. Show Cause Response due by 3/26/2019. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 4/2/2019 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 1/18/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2019)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi DISMISSING CLAIMS 1-4 and DENYING 100 Motion for Summary Judgment re CLAIM 5. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2018)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 68 motion to dismiss claims five and six of the first amended complaint. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
December 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting in part and denying in part Dkt. No. 10 Motion to Dismiss. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunil Kumaran Vethody et al v. National Default Services Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunil Kumaran Vethody
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bindu Baburajan Vethody
Represented By: Jessica Ryan Galletta
Represented By: Matthew David Mellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?