Wallace et al v. City Of San Jose

Plaintiff: Darren Wallace, Keith Hart and Mark Leeds
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Case Number: 5:2016cv04914
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2018 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/14/2018. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2018)
April 27, 2018 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd denying 66 plaintiffs' Motion to Relate Cases. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
December 5, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 48 defendant's Motion for Decertification. (hrllc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
April 18, 2017 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting (as modified) 39 plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace et al v. City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Wallace
Represented By: Carol Lynn Koenig
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Hart
Represented By: Carol Lynn Koenig
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Leeds
Represented By: Carol Lynn Koenig
Represented By: Christopher Eugene Platten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of San Jose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?