Brezoczky v. Domtar Corp
Plaintiff: Kelly Brezoczky
Defendant: Domtar Corporation and Polsinelli PC
Case Number: 5:2016cv04995
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/5/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2017)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING 75 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/31/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2017)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING 73 STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT POLSINELLI PC WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/30/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2017)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 STIPULATION TO EXTEND MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/23/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2017)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISPOSITIVE MOTION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/17/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING 56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2017)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING 54 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 9/28/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Order by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd re: 51 Discovery Dispute Joint Report #1. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/31/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2017)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 PRETRIAL ORDER(JURY). The Trial Setting Conference scheduled for 6/8/2017 is VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY and the parties are ordered to comply with the schedule set forth in the order. Joint Pretrial Conference Statement due by 12/28/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/11/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 5th Floor, San Jose. Jury Selection set for 1/25/2018 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 1/25/2018 01:30 PM. Jury Trial dates:1/26 09:00 AM, 1/30 09:00 AM, 1/31 09:00 AM, 2/2. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 5/31/2017.(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2017)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brezoczky v. Domtar Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Brezoczky
Represented By: John Patrick Killacky
Represented By: Derek J Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Domtar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polsinelli PC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?