Ahn et al v. Scarlett et al

Plaintiff: Gregory Ahn, Jonathan White and Cult of 8, Inc.
Defendant: Matthew D. Scarlett and Alcohol By Volume, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv05437
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Monterey
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Edward J. Davila
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 99 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 10/10/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2017)
August 4, 2017 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 92 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 8/4/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2017)
July 6, 2017 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESETTING DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 7/6/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
March 31, 2017 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 22 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 4/6/2017 IS VACATED - NO APPEARANCE NECESSARY. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 3/31/2017. (ejdlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2017) Modified text on 3/31/2017 (amkS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahn et al v. Scarlett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ahn
Represented By: Alice Y Chu
Represented By: William J. Goines
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Represented By: Karen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan White
Represented By: Alice Y Chu
Represented By: William J. Goines
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Represented By: Karen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cult of 8, Inc.
Represented By: Alice Y Chu
Represented By: William J. Goines
Represented By: Cindy Hamilton
Represented By: Karen Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew D. Scarlett
Represented By: Aviva Judith Gilbert
Represented By: Richard Allen VanDuzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcohol By Volume, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony David Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?