Timothy Glick v. Performant Financial Corporation

Plaintiff: Timothy Glick
Defendant: Performant Financial Corporation
Case Number: 5:2016cv05461
Filed: September 23, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jon S. Tigar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2017 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STAY by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying 35 Motion to Stay. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2017)
January 18, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 32 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Timothy Glick filed by Timothy Glick. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 18, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 11, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Protective Order) filed by Performant Financial Corporation. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 11, 2017. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
December 19, 2016 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Timothy Glick filed by Timothy Glick. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2016. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timothy Glick v. Performant Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Glick
Represented By: Stefan Coleman
Represented By: Rebecca Leah Davis
Represented By: Richard Toshiyuki Drury
Represented By: Patrick Harry Peluso
Represented By: Steven Lezell Woodrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performant Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?