Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 5:2016cv05824
Filed: October 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/25/17. (dl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2017)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/17/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2017)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE by Hon. William Alsup granting 12 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2017)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE TO FILE A RENEWED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/4/17. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2017)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA by Hon. William Alsup denying 7 Motion for Leave to File.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2016)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Henrik Mosesian Mosesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?