Koghan v. United Legal Group, CCB

Plaintiff: Steven Koghan
Defendant: United Legal Group, CCB
Case Number: 5:2016cv06130
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2017 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. Plaintiffs former counsel is directed to serve a copy of this order on plaintiff and to file a proof of service with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 6/13/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2017)
May 30, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL. Plaintiff to appear and show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Hearing set for 6/13/2017 10:00 AM. Trinette Kent directed to serve this order on plaintiff and file a proof of service with the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 5/30/2017. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2017)
April 24, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd granting 18 plaintiff's counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koghan v. United Legal Group, CCB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Koghan
Represented By: Trinette Gragirena Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Legal Group, CCB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?