Wilson-v-NBS Default Service, LLC, et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey-Merritt Wilson
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv06253
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Referring Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 18, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 26 REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION REGARDING JURISDICTION; REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE DUTY; REGARDING AFFIDAVITS; REGARDING PUBLIC TRUST. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/18/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2017)
January 3, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 17 , 18 , 19 , 20 JUDICIAL NOTICES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/3/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2017)
December 2, 2016 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 14 MANDATORY JUDICIALLY NOTICED EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/2/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2016)
November 7, 2016 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 8 PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, AND DECLARATORY RELIEF. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/7/2016. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson-v-NBS Default Service, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey-Merritt Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NBS Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?