Davis et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Doris Davis and Marion Grant
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs, U.S. Department of Defense, Defense Finance and Accounting Service, Robert A. McDonald, Ashton B. Carter, Teresa A. McKay and United States Of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv06258
Filed: October 28, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Referring Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management conference. Joint Case Management Statement due by 8/21/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/28/2017 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/25/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2017)
June 27, 2017 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing case management conference and ORDER of reference. Further Case Management Conference is continued to 7/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/24/2017. All discovery disputes are referred to a magistrate judge. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/27/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2017)
June 26, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 58 Proposed protective order. Supplemental declaration due by 06/29/17. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/26/17. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2017)
May 9, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 38 Defendants' motion to dismiss and denying 42 Defendants' motion to stay discovery. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Davis
Represented By: Logan P. Brown
Represented By: Ronald Chester Cohen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Represented By: Bradley H. Ellis
Represented By: Howard Joel Rubinroit
Represented By: Barton Frank Stichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marion Grant
Represented By: Logan P. Brown
Represented By: Ronald Chester Cohen
Represented By: Bradley Dugan
Represented By: Bradley H. Ellis
Represented By: Howard Joel Rubinroit
Represented By: Barton Frank Stichman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Defense
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defense Finance and Accounting Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton B. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa A. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?