Power Integrations, Inc. v. On Semiconductor Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Defendant: On Semiconductor Corporation and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC
Case Number: 5:2016cv06371
Filed: November 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia K DeMarchi
Referring Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
2 Judge: Sallie Kim
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Reset Final Pretrial Conference re #288 Order. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 11/1/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2019)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER RESETTING THE FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 09/06/2019. (blflc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2019)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 287 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND FINDING MOOT IN PART ON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Public version of under seal order at #285 ). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/22/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER RE REDACTION OF #285 ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND FINDING MOOT IN PART ON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 285 **UNDER SEAL** ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND FINDING MOOT IN PART #221 ON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #224 PI'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 284 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC re #283 Exhibits to an Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, Filed in Response to the Order Concerning Exhibit Y (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Filing 283 EXHIBITS re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Filed in Response to Dkt No. 282 Order to File Exhibit Y to Summary Judgment Motion, filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit W, #3 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER DIRECTING ON TO FILE EXHIBIT Y TO SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION BY 5 P.M. ON JULY 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/24/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2019)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER GRANTING #280 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE by Mabey. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/16/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2019)
July 15, 2019 Filing 280 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13519291.) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Mabey, Warren) (Filed on 7/15/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER GRANTING #277 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Sabrina D. Wilson). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/5/2019. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING #276 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Whitney A. Reichel). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/5/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 277 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13491169.) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Wilson, Sabrina) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 3, 2019 Filing 276 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13490004.) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Reichel, Whitney) (Filed on 7/3/2019)
July 2, 2019 Filing 275 RESPONSE re #272 Notice (Other) of the Grant of Certiorari by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER GRANTING #273 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE (re attorney Brian P. Boyd). Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/2/2019.(blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 273 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13483220.) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Boyd, Brian) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
July 1, 2019 Filing 272 NOTICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC , Notice of the Grant of Certiorari by the Supreme Court of the United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 7/1/2019)
June 25, 2019 Filing 271 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Joseph Wilson for ON Semiconductor Corp. and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC (Wilson, Bryan) (Filed on 6/25/2019)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING #269 STIPULATION CONCERNING ON'S WITHDRAWAL OF ISSUE NO. 6 IN ON'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/21/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 21, 2019 Filing 269 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Withdrawal of Issue No. 6 in ON's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/21/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 268 NOTICE by Power Integrations, Inc. , ON Semiconductor Corp., & Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC of Fed. Cir. Decision on Validity of Certain Claims of the '079 & "876 Patents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 17, 2019 Filing 267 RESPONSE re #251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 UNREDACTED 223-25 - Ex. 57 to Headley Dec ISO PI MSJ)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/17/2019)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER APPROVING #265 JOINT STATEMENT OF POWER INTEGRATIONS AND ON SEMICONDUCTOR ON MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/14/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 14, 2019 Filing 265 Statement ,Joint Statement of Power Integrations and ON Semiconductor on Mediation, by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/14/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 264 RESPONSE re #251 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal,,, by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LESS REDACTED 223-4 PI's MSJ & Mot to Strike, #2 UNREDACTED 223-24 Ex 56 to Headley Dec ISO PI's MSJ & Mot to Strike, #3 LESS REDACTED 237-4 Kelley Dec ISO PI's Opp to ON's MSJ)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 263 EXHIBITS re #234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ,Filed in Response to Omnibus Order on Sealing Motions, Dkt. 251 filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 ON Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #234 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 13, 2019 Filing 262 EXHIBITS re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal , Filed in Response to Omnibus Order on Sealing Motions, Dkt.251 filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) #220 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/13/2019)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER REQUESTING STIPULATION RE ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ISSUE NO. 6 ON OR BEFORE JUNE 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/11/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 11, 2019 Filing 260 EXHIBITS re #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mot to Compel Knowledgeable Witness & Legible Schematics Order Requiring Defendants to File Cited Excerpts of Hari Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcri filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) #213 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/11/2019)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER REQUESTING NOTICE FROM PARTIES RE FEDERAL CIRCUIT DECISION WITHIN 3 DAYS OF ISSUANCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/7/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 258 Transcript of Proceedings held on 6-6-19, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #256 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/5/2019. (Related documents(s) #256 ) (las, ) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 7, 2019 Filing 257 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/7/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 256 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 06/06/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/6/2019)
June 6, 2019 Filing 255 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2019. re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions (REDACTED) filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Counsel present argument. Matters taken under submission.Counsel to meet and confer re: further settlement needs by 6/14/19. Court to issue written order. Total Time in Court: 1 hour 50 minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley, Frank Scherkenbach, Howard Pollack, Neil Warren. Defendant Attorney: Colette Mayer, Seth Lindner, Roger Fulghum, Nick Schuneman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2019)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi re #218 Discovery Letter Brief re Privity/Issue Preclusion. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 253 Order Requiring Defendants to File Cited Excerpts of Hari Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/4/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Order granting #213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mot to Compel Knowledgeable Witness & Legible Schematics filed by Power Integrations, Inc. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 6/4/2019. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 OMNIBUS ORDER ON #220 , #223 , #234 , #237 SEALING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/3/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting in part and denying in part #217 Discovery Letter Brief re ON's 30(b)(6) Witness and Schematics for ON Accused Products. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2019)
May 26, 2019 Filing 249 Transcript of Proceedings held on 05/21/2019, before Magistrate Virginia K. DeMarchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #243 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 6/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2019. (Related documents(s) #243 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2019)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER GRANTING #247 STIPULATION CONCERNING EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/24/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 24, 2019 Filing 247 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation Concerning Extension of the Due Date for Rebuttal Expert Reports filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/24/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 246 REPLY (re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions (REDACTED) ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit 59, #3 Exhibit 60, #4 Exhibit 61)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 23, 2019 Filing 245 REPLY (re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit X, #3 Exhibit Z, #4 Exhibit AA, #5 Exhibit BB, #6 Exhibit CC, #7 Exhibit DD, #8 Exhibit EE, #9 Exhibit FF, #10 Exhibit GG, #11 Exhibit Y)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/23/2019)
May 21, 2019 Filing 244 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/21/2019) (TRANSCRIBER: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 5/21/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 243 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 05/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/21/2019) (TRANSCRIBER: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 5/21/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
May 21, 2019 Filing 242 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/21/2019 10:03:07 AM ]. File Size [ 39000 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:21:15 ]. (courtspeak).
May 21, 2019 Filing 241 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi: Discovery Hearing held on 5/21/2019.Matters taken under submission. Court to issue written order.FTR Time: 10:03-11:24. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulgham and Colette Mayer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/21/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 240 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ON's Response to PI's MSJ filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #234 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 Filing 239 Declaration of Roger Fulghum in Support of #237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of PI's Opp to ON's MSJ filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #237 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/20/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 238 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Arthur Kelley (REDACTED), #2 Declaration of Michael Headley, #3 Exhibit 1 to Headley Dec (SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL))(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 237 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of PI's Opp to ON's MSJ filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Kelley Dec ISO PI's Opp to ON's MSJ, #4 UNREDACTED Kelley Dec ISO PI's Opp to ON's MSJ, #5 Exhibit 1 to Headley Dec ISO PI's Opp to ON's MSJ (Submitted Entirely Under Seal))(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 236 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC re #235 Opposition/Response to Motion,, (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 235 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #224 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions (REDACTED) ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit A Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G Filed Under seal, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 16, 2019 Filing 234 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Exhibit Unredacted version of Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit G)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/16/2019)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER GRANTING #232 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Lindner. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/13/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 232 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Seth Lindner ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13343409.) filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lindner, Seth) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 231 Declaration of Michael R. Headley in Support of #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #220 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 13, 2019 Filing 230 Declaration of Roger Fulghum in Support of #223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mot for Summary Judgment and Mot to Strike Expert Opinions filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #223 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/13/2019)
May 8, 2019 Filing 229 Amended Proposed Order re #223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mot for Summary Judgment and Mot to Strike Expert Opinions by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/8/2019) Modified on 5/10/2019 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
May 7, 2019 Filing 228 Proposed Order re #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Proposed Amended Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/7/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED ORDERS FOR MOTIONS TO SEAL; CONTINUING OPPOSITION DATES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/3/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 226 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi granting #225 Stipulation. The 5/7/2019 Discovery Hearing is CONTINUED to 5/21/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 3, 2019 Filing 225 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 219 Clerk's Notice,,, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings,, Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning a Two-Week Continuance of the Discovery Hearing Set for May 7, 2019 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/3/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 224 MOTION for Summary Judgment and, MOTION to Strike Expert Opinions (REDACTED) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2019 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/16/2019. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Errata 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 14 (13 was deliberately omitted), #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26 -SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #28 Exhibit 27-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #29 Exhibit 28-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #30 Exhibit 29, #31 Exhibit 30, #32 Exhibit 31, #33 Exhibit 32, #34 Exhibit 33-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #35 Exhibit 34-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #36 Exhibit 35-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #37 Exhibit 36-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #45 Exhibit 44-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #46 Exhibit 45-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #49 Exhibit 48-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #50 Exhibit 49-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #51 Exhibit 50-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #52 Exhibit 51-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #53 Exhibit 52-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #54 Exhibit 53-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #55 Exhibit 54-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL), #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL, #58 Exhibit 57-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL, #59 Exhibit 58-SUBMITTED ENTIRELY UNDER SEAL)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 223 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mot for Summary Judgment and Mot to Strike Expert Opinions filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED MSJ & Mot to Strike, #4 CONF MSJ & Mot to Strike, #5 Exhibit 24, #6 Exhibit 26, #7 Exhibit 27, #8 Exhibit 28, #9 Exhibit 33, #10 Exhibit 34, #11 Exhibit 35, #12 Exhibit 36, #13 Exhibit 43, #14 Exhibit 44, #15 Exhibit 45, #16 Exhibit 47, #17 Exhibit 48, #18 Exhibit 49, #19 Exhibit 50, #20 Exhibit 51, #21 Exhibit 52, #22 Exhibit 53, #23 Exhibit 54, #24 Exhibit 56, #25 Exhibit 57, #26 Exhibit 58)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 222 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC re #221 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 221 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Responses due by 5/16/2019. Replies due by 5/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Sealed, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit A)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
May 2, 2019 Filing 220 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Unredacted Version of Motion for Summary Judgment, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit Sealed Version of Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit V, #13 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit V, #14 Exhibit Redacted Version of Exhibit W, #15 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Exhibit W)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/2/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 219 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING DISCOVERY HEARING re #217 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re ON's 30(b)(6) Witness and Schematics for ON Accused Products, #218 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re Privity/Issue Preclusion. Discovery Hearing set for 5/7/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 218 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre Privity/Issue Preclusion filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Scherkenbach, Frank) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 30, 2019 Filing 217 Joint Discovery Letter Briefre ON's 30(b)(6) Witness and Schematics for ON Accused Products filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Scherkenbach, Frank) (Filed on 4/30/2019)
April 29, 2019 Filing 216 Declaration of Roger Fulghum #213 In Support of Power Integrations Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Power Integrations Motion to Compel a Knowledgeable 30 B 6 Witness and Legible Schematics filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 4/29/2019)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 215 Order by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi denying without prejudice #212 Motion to Compel Privity Discovery, #214 Motion to Compel Knowledgeable Witness & Legible Schematics. Parties' joint discovery letter briefs due by 4/30/2019. 6/4/2019 Hearing is VACATED. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 214 MOTION to Compel Knowledgeable Witness & Legible Schematics (REDACTED) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Responses due by 5/8/2019. Replies due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3 (Submitted Entirely Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 4 (Submitted Entirely Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 5 (Submitted Entirely Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 6 (Submitted Entirely Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7 (Submitted Entirely Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 8 (Submitted Entirely Under Seal), #10 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 213 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Mot to Compel Knowledgeable Witness & Legible Schematics filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED MTC a Knowledgeable Witness & Schematics, #4 UNREDACTED MTC a Knowledgeable Witness & Schematics, #5 Confidential (UNREDACTED) Ex. 3 to Headley Dec ISO MTC, #6 Confidential (UNREDACTED) Ex. 4 to Headley Dec ISO MTC, #7 Confidential (UNREDACTED) Ex. 5 to Headley Dec ISO MTC, #8 Confidential (UNREDACTED) Ex. 6 to Headley Dec ISO MTC, #9 Confidential (UNREDACTED) Ex. 7 to Headley Dec ISO MTC, #10 Confidential (UNREDACTED) Ex. 8 to Headley Dec ISO MTC)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
April 24, 2019 Filing 212 MOTION to Compel Privity Discovery filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/4/2019 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 5/8/2019. Replies due by 5/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/24/2019)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER RE CASE SCHEDULE AND NARROWING PARTIES' CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/20/2019. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2019)
March 19, 2019 Filing 210 Statement / Joint Submission Concerning Case Schedule & Narrowing the Parties' Claims by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/19/2019)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING #208 STIPULATION CONCERNING EXTENSION OF THE DUE DATE FOR JOINT COMMENTS ON POWER INTEGRATIONS'S PROPOSED NARROWING OF INVALIDATING REFERENCES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/18/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 18, 2019 Filing 208 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Extension of The Due Date for Joint Comments on Power Integrations's Proposed Narrowing of Invalidating References filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/18/2019)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED #206 STIPULATION CONCERNING CASE SCHEDULE. Additional joint statement due by March 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/13/2019.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 13, 2019 Filing 206 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Case Schedule filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/13/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 205 Transcript of Proceedings held on 03/01/2019, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Peggy Schuerger/Ad Hoc Reporting, telephone number (619) 228-3774/adhocreporting@aol.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #203 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 3/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2019. (Related documents(s) #203 ) (pls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2019)
March 4, 2019 Filing 204 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/01/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/4/2019) (TRANSCRIBER: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 3/4/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2019 Filing 203 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/01/2019 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/4/2019) (TRANSCRIBER: AD HOC REPORTING) Modified on 3/4/2019 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
March 1, 2019 Filing 202 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Scheduling Conference held on 3/1/2019.FTR Time: 1:29 - 2:19. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney: Roger J. Fulghum. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/1/2019)
February 28, 2019 Filing 201 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Supplemental Joint Case Management Statement filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/28/2019)
February 26, 2019 Filing 200 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by Noon on 2/28/2019. Telephone Conference set for 3/1/2019 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel may appear by Courtcall without Further Order of the Court. All Parties are to schedule their telephonic appearances at least 24 hours before the hearing by contacting Courtcall at 866-582-6878. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019)
January 15, 2019 Filing 199 NOTICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC ON Semiconductor Corp. and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC's Notice of Service of Subpoena on Texas Instruments Inc. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 1/15/2019)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 198 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,297,623, 7,538,533, 8,115,457. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/13/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018)
November 9, 2018 Filing 197 Statement , Joint Statement of Indefiniteness of the Claims that Depend from Indefinite Independent Claims by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 11/9/2018)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER CONSTRUING CLAIMS IN U.S. PATENT NOS. 6,249,876, 6,297,623, 6,333,624, 6,429,709, 7,239,119, 7,447,601, 7,538,533, 8,115,457. Joint statement re indefiniteness of dependent claims due November 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/26/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2018)
October 22, 2018 Filing 195 NOTICE by Power Integrations, Inc. of Reexamination Certificate (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment - Ex Parte Reexam Certificate for US Patent 6,249,876 C1)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/22/2018)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER GRANTING #167 ONS RENEWED MOTION TO STRIKE LEGACY-FAIRCHILD PRODUCTS FROM POWER INTEGRATIONS INCS COUNTERCLAIM FOR INFRINGEMENT OF THE 876 PATENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/10/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2018)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER VACATING OCTOBER 11, 2018 HEARING ON MOTION TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/5/2018. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2018)
September 28, 2018 Filing 192 Transcript of Proceedings held on 09/21/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #190 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2018. (Related documents(s) #190 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 9/28/2018)
September 24, 2018 Filing 191 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 9/21/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 9/24/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 190 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 09/21/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/21/2018)
September 21, 2018 Filing 189 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Claims Construction / Markman Hearing held on 9/21/2018.Total Time in Court: 3:10. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Howard Pollack, Neil Warren, Michael Headley, Frank Scherkenback. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum, Colette Mayer, Nick Schuneman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/21/2018)
September 20, 2018 Filing 188 RESPONSE to re #186 Supplemental Brief re Claim Construction by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/20/2018)
September 19, 2018 Filing 187 Declaration of Roger Fulghum in Support of #186 Supplemental Brief Corrected Declaration of Roger Fulghum in Support of Supplemental Claim Construction Brief filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 9/19/2018)
September 18, 2018 Filing 186 Supplemental Brief ON Semiconductor Corporation's Supplemental Claim Construction Brief Regarding the '623 Patent filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 9/18/2018)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER GRANTING #181 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF; DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF AS SEPARATE DOCKET ENTRY ON OR BEFORE SEPTEMBER 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/17/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2018)
September 14, 2018 Filing 184 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #181 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Markman Brief ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 9/14/2018)
September 13, 2018 Filing 183 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Tutorial Hearing held on 9/13/2018. Off Record. Plaintiff Attorney: Howard Pollack, Neil Warren, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum, Colette Mayer, Nich Schuneman, Brett Thompsen. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/13/2018)
September 12, 2018 Filing 182 Mail sent to Frank Everett Scherkenbach returned as undeliverable re #175 Order on Motion to Strike,. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2018)
September 10, 2018 Filing 181 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Markman Brief filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Responses due by 9/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 9/10/2018)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER GRANTING #179 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE BY THOMPSEN. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/6/2018.(blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2018)
September 5, 2018 Filing 179 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12651475.) filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit TX Supreme Ct. Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit TX Bar Assoc. Cert of Good Standing)(Thompsen, Brett) (Filed on 9/5/2018)
August 23, 2018 Filing 178 REPLY (re #167 MOTION to Strike Renewed Motion to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products from Power Integrations Inc's Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit F)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/23/2018)
August 21, 2018 Filing 177 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #176 Document E-Filed Under Seal by Court Staff (pmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 176 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL by Court Staff. ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions. Plaintiff's Second Amended Infringement Contentions due by 9/11/2018. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 174 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #167 MOTION to Strike Renewed Motion to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products from Power Integrations Inc's Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit 1)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 16, 2018 Filing 173 Transcript of Proceedings held on 07/24/2018, before Judge DiMarchi. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #164 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 9/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2018. (Related documents(s) #164 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 172 Brief re #159 Brief Reply Claim Construction Brief filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William Bohannon in Support of Power Integrations' Reply Claim Construction Brief, #2 Appendix A to William Bohannon Declaration in Support of Power Integrations' Reply Claim Construction Brief)(Related document(s) #159 ) (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 9, 2018 Filing 171 Brief re #157 Brief Reply Claim Construction Brief, Pursuant to Patent L.R.4-5(c) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/9/2018)
August 3, 2018 Set Hearing as to #167 MOTION to Strike Renewed Motion to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products from Power Integrations Inc's Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 170 RESPONSE to re #157 Brief -Power Integrations' Responsive Claim Construction Brief by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 169 EXHIBITS re #168 Brief,, Exhibit 14 to Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #168 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 168 Brief re #159 Brief Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Responsive Claim Construction Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) #159 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
August 2, 2018 Filing 167 MOTION to Strike Renewed Motion to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products from Power Integrations Inc's Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Responses due by 8/16/2018. Replies due by 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/2/2018)
July 25, 2018 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 07/24/2018 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 7/25/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 7/25/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi GRANTING #142 Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; #147 Power Integrations, Inc.'s Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2018)
July 24, 2018 Filing 164 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on July 24, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 7/24/2018) (TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALINE) Modified on 7/24/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2018 Filing 163 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2018. re #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Counsel present arguments. Matter is taken under submission. Court to issue written order. FTR Time: 10:01-11:17. Plaintiff Attorney: Howard Pollack and Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney: Colette Reiner Mayer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2018)
July 12, 2018 Reset Claims Tutorial Hearing re #162 Order, Claims Construction Tutorial Hearing set for 9/13/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER RESETTING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL TO THURSDAY, SEPTEMBER 13, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/10/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 10, 2018 Filing 161 Declaration of Roger Fulghum in Support of #157 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #157 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 7/10/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 160 Declaration of Howard G. Pollack in Support of #159 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Howard Pollack, #2 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Howard Pollack, #3 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Howard Pollack, #4 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Howard Pollack, #5 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Howard Pollack, #6 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Howard Pollack, #7 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Howard Pollack)(Related document(s) #159 ) (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 159 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER DIRECTING CLERK OF COURT TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CONSOLIDATE CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/9/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 9, 2018 Filing 157 Brief Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 7/9/2018)
July 6, 2018 Filing 156 CLERK'S NOTICE. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing on #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions set for 7/24/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 2, 5th Floor before Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi. (vkdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2018)
June 27, 2018 Filing 155 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Power Integrations, Inc.. Amendment to #97 Claim Construction Statement and Prehearing Statement of Power Integrations and ON Semiconductor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/27/2018)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER GRANTING #153 STIPULATION CONCERNING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/26/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2018)
June 25, 2018 Filing 153 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Claim Construction Deadlines filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/25/2018)
June 15, 2018 Filing 152 REPLY (re #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/15/2018)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #117 ON SEMICONDUCTOR CORP. AND SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS INDUSTRIES, LLC'S MOTION TO STRIKE LEGACY-FAIRCHILD PRODUCTS FROM POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.'S COUNTERCLAIM FOR INFRINGEMENT OF THE '876 PATENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/14/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2018)
June 13, 2018 Filing 150 MOTION #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia DeMarchi. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2018)
June 12, 2018 Filing 149 Declaration of Roger Fulghum in Support of #147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Power Integrations' Opposition to Motion to Strike filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #147 ) (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/12/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 148 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit 1 (filed under seal), #3 Exhibit 2 (filed under seal), #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7 (filed under seal), #9 Exhibit 8 (filed under seal), #10 Exhibit 9 (filed under seal), #11 Exhibit 10 (filed under seal), #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 8, 2018 Filing 147 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Power Integrations' Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED VERSION OF EX. 1, #4 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 1, #5 REDACTED VERSION OF EX. 2, #6 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 2, #7 REDACTED VERSION OF EX. 7, #8 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 7, #9 REDACTED VERSION OF EX. 8, #10 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 8, #11 REDACTED VERSION OF EX. 9, #12 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 9, #13 REDACTED VERSION OF EX. 10, #14 UNREDACTED VERSION OF EX. 10)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/8/2018)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K DeMarchi for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Judge Executive Committee on 6/7/2018. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2018)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER DENYING #101 POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER CLAIMS REGARDING THE '876 PATENT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/5/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 144 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC re #142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 143 MOTION to Strike Amended Infringement Contentions filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Responses due by 6/8/2018. Replies due by 6/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 25, 2018 Filing 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex B, #4 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex B, #5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex E, #6 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex E, #7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex G, #8 Exhibit Unredacted Version of Ex G)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/25/2018)
May 11, 2018 Filing 141 Statement re #117 MOTION to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products From Power Integrations, Inc.'s Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent, 136 Motion Hearing,,, Joint Statement of ON Semiconductor Corp. and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLCs and Power Integrations, Inc. by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 5/11/2018)
May 7, 2018 Filing 140 REPLY (re #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent ) ON Semiconductor Corp. and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC's Supplemental Reply in Opposition to Power Integrations, Inc's Motion to Sever and Transfer Claims Regarding the '876 Patent filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 5/7/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 139 Supplemental Brief re #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #101 ) (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
May 3, 2018 Filing 138 NOTICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney John M. Neukom (Neukom, John) (Filed on 5/3/2018)
April 28, 2018 Filing 137 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/27/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #134 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2018. (Related documents(s) #134 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 4/28/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 136 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 4/27/2018 re #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #117 MOTION to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products From Power Integrations, Inc.'s Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Supplemental Briefing on Motion to Sever due 5/3/2018, Reply due 5/7/2018. Joint Statement on Motion to Strike due 5/11/2018. Total Time in Court: 26 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Howard Pollack, Michael Headley. Defendant Attorney: Golette Mayer, Roger Fulghum. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/27/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/27/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 27, 2018 Filing 134 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 04/27/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 4/27/2018)
April 16, 2018 Filing 133 Transcript of Proceedings held on 02/27/2018, before Judge LLOYD. Court Reporter/Transcriber Victoria L. Valine, telephone number victoriavalinecsr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #132 Transcript Order, ) Redaction Request due 5/7/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/16/2018. (Related documents(s) #132 ) (vlv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/16/2018)
April 12, 2018 Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on February 27, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter FTR - San Jose. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 4/12/2018)(TRANSCRIBER: VICTORIA VALENE) Modified on 4/12/2018 (lmh, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2018 Filing 131 Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-22-18, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lee-Anne Shortridge, telephone number 408-287-4580 email: lee-anne_shortridge@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #125 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/9/2018. (Related documents(s) #125 ) (las, ) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING #129 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 4/10/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2018)
April 9, 2018 Filing 129 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Engel ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12258587.) filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Engel, Joshua) (Filed on 4/9/2018)
April 3, 2018 Filing 128 REPLY (re #117 MOTION to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products From Power Integrations, Inc.'s Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit I, #3 Exhibit J)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 4/3/2018)
March 29, 2018 Filing 127 REPLY (re #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/29/2018)
March 27, 2018 Filing 126 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #117 MOTION to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products From Power Integrations, Inc.'s Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/27/2018)
March 26, 2018 Filing 125 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 3/23/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Lee-Anne Shortridge. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/26/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 124 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Telephone Conference held on 3/22/2018.Total Time in Court: 27 Minutes. Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Micahel Headley via Courtcall, Frank Scherkenbach via Courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum via Courtcall, Colette Mayer via Courtcall. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Reset Claims Construction Tutorial and Construction Hearing per #122 . Claims Tutorial reset for 9/14/2018 09:00 AM and Claims Construction Hearing reset for 9/21/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Filing 123 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent ) On Semiconductor Corp. and Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC's Corrected Opposition to Power Integrations, Inc's Motion to Sever and Transfer Claims Regarding the '876 Patent filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER RESETTING CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION HEARING. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER GRANTING #120 STIPULATION CONCERNING PAGE LIMITS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/16/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Filing 120 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #115 Order on Stipulation Concerning Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Set Telephonic Conference re #119 Order. Telephone Conference set for 3/22/2018 02:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/16/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2018)
March 14, 2018 Filing 118 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT --REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 3/14/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 117 MOTION to Strike Legacy-Fairchild Products From Power Integrations, Inc.'s Counterclaim for Infringement of the '876 Patent filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/27/2018. Replies due by 4/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Proposed Order)(Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Filing 116 ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM Answer to Docket Entry #100 byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER REGARDING #111 STIPULATION CONCERNING PAGE LIMITS FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEFS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/13/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2018)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER STRIKING #108 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER; AND DENYING #112 , #113 PARTIES' MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS REGARDING BRIEFING ON MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/12/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 12, 2018 Filing 113 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION For leave to exceed Court's page limits re #108 Opposition/Response to Motion,, filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Responses due by 3/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Proposed Order)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/12/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 112 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION for Leave to Exceed the Page Limit for Power Integrations Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Sever and Transfer Claims Re: the 876 Patent [UNOPPOSED] filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 3/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 9, 2018 Filing 111 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order Concerning Page Limits for Claim Construction Briefs filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/9/2018)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER AND TRANSFER CLAIMS RE '876 PATENT TO FRIDAY, APRIL 27, 2018 AT 9:00 A.M. #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent.Motion Hearing set for 4/27/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman.Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/07/2018. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER GRANTING #107 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/7/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 108 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Roger Fulghum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
March 6, 2018 Filing 107 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-12164320.) filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Schuneman, Nicholas) (Filed on 3/6/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 Order granting #73 Motion to Strike Patent Infringement Contentions. Amended infringement contentions due by 3/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/27/2018. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Order denying #72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/27/2018. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2018)
February 27, 2018 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd: Motion Hearing held on 2/27/2018. re #73 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC Hearing held. Court to issue written ruling. FTR Time: 10:03-10:16. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley and Howard Pollack. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum and Colette Mayer. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (pmc, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/27/2018)
February 26, 2018 Filing 103 ANSWER to Counterclaim /Answer to 2nd Amended Counterclaim byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/26/2018)
February 22, 2018 Filing 102 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent. Motion Hearing reset to 4/26/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 101 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Claims re '876 Patent filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2018 09:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 3/6/2018. Replies due by 3/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael R. Headley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 20, 2018 Filing 100 ANSWER to Amended Complaint No. Three for Patent Infringement and Declaratory Judgment byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/20/2018)
February 16, 2018 Filing 99 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Roger Fulghum (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/16/2018)
February 13, 2018 Filing 98 NOTICE of Appearance by Colette Reiner Mayer (Mayer, Colette) (Filed on 2/13/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 97 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT and Prehearing Statement of Parties ON Semiconductor and Power Integrations filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 12, 2018 Filing 96 Second Amended ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM Counterclaims against Power Integrations, Inc. bySemiconductor Components Industries, LLC, On Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/12/2018)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING #93 STIPULATION REGARDING EXTENSION OF DUE DATE FOR FILING JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION AND PREHEARING STATEMENT UNDER PATENT L.R. 4-3. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 94 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third Amended Complaint against Power Integrations, Inc.. Filed bySemiconductor Components Industries, LLC, On Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exs A-D, #2 Exhibit Exs E-F, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Exhibit H, #5 Exhibit Exs. I-J, #6 Exhibit Ex. K, #7 Exhibit Ex. L)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
February 5, 2018 Filing 93 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Due Date for Filing of the Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Under Patent L.R. 4-3 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/5/2018)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER REGARDING #55 MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS RE '876, '272, '601 PATENTS; AND #83 , #84 MOTIONS FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIALS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 1/24/2018. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2018)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Order granting #88 stipulated protective order, as modified by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 1/22/2018. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 90 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC, for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 89 Transcript of Proceedings held on 01/11/2018, before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Summer Fisher, telephone number 408-288-6150 summer_fisher@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #86 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2018. (Related documents(s) #86 ) (Fisher, Summer) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 19, 2018 Filing 88 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Protective Order filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 1/19/2018)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING #61 POWER INTEGRATIONS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIM WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2018)
January 12, 2018 Filing 86 TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 01/11/2018 before Judge Beth Labson Freeman by Power Integrations, Inc., for Court Reporter Summer Fisher. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/12/2018)
January 11, 2018 Filing 85 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2018 re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Power Integrations, Inc., #55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim filed by Power Integrations, Inc. The Court takes the matters under submission. Written Order to be issued.Total Time in Court: 54 Minutes. Court Reporter: Summer Fisher. Plaintiff Attorney: Frank Scherkenbach, Howard Pollack, Michael Headley, Clifford Walker. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum, John Neukom. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2018)
January 10, 2018 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Material filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 1/10/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Material Relating to Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Claims re '876, '272, and '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
January 5, 2018 Filing 82 CLERK'S NOTICE. Judge Freeman has referred #73 motion to strike infringement contentions to Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. The hearing on the motion is hereby reset to 2/27/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2018)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER GRANTING #80 EXTENSION OF DUE DATE FOR SERVICE OF DISCLOSURES UNDER PATENT L.R. 3-8, 3-9, 4-2, 4-3, 4-4 AND 4-5. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/27/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2017)
December 22, 2017 Filing 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Due Date for Service of Disclosures Under Patent L.R. 3-8, 3-9, 4-2, 4-3, 4-4 and 4-5 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 12/22/2017)
December 14, 2017 Filing 79 MOTION #73 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions. REFERRED to Judge Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2017)
December 13, 2017 Filing 78 REPLY (re #73 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 12/13/2017)
December 12, 2017 Filing 77 NOTICE RE JUDGE'S LAW CLERK ON WORKING ON THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/12/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2017)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING #68 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL MATERIALS IN OPPOSITION TO POWER INTEGRATION, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 12/11/2017. (blflc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2017)
December 6, 2017 Filing 75 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #73 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 12/6/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 74 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC re #72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 73 MOTION to Strike Infringement Contentions filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 12/6/2017. Replies due by 12/13/2017. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Neukom in Support of Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
November 22, 2017 Filing 72 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Neukom in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 REDACTED Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions, #4 SEALED Unredacted Motion to Strike Infringement Contentions, #5 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 1, #6 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 2, #7 Exhibit SEALED Ex. 3)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 11/22/2017)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING #70 EXTENSION OF DUE DATE FOR SERVICE OF DISCLOSURES UNDER PATENT L.R. 3-3 AND 3-4. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 10/25/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2017)
October 24, 2017 Filing 70 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Due Date for Service of Disclosures Under Patent L.R. 3-3 and 3-4 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 10/24/2017)
October 17, 2017 Filing 69 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #68 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Material ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 10/17/2017)
October 13, 2017 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Material filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Neukom, John) (Filed on 10/13/2017)
October 5, 2017 Filing 67 REPLY (re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 10/5/2017)
September 28, 2017 Filing 66 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #61 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/28/2017)
September 21, 2017 Filing 65 REPLY (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 9/21/2017)
September 18, 2017 Filing 64 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 63 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Neukom, John) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 62 ANSWER to Counterclaim byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 61 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Inequitable Conduct Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/28/2017. Replies due by 10/5/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 14, 2017 Filing 60 Renotice motion hearing re #55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Related document(s) #55 ) (Pollack, Howard) (Filed on 9/14/2017)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING #58 STIPULATION CONCERNING EXTENSION OF DUE DATE FOR SERVICE OF DISCLOSURES UNDER PATENT L.R. 3-1 AND 3-2. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 9/11/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 11, 2017 Filing 58 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Extension of Due Date for Service of Disclosures Under Patent L.R.3-1 and 3-2 filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 9/11/2017)
September 7, 2017 Filing 57 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING MOTION HEARING as to #55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2017)
September 1, 2017 ***Disregard Filing Error. Counsel Contacted*** Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #54 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC ***Please Correct Document to List Counter-Claimant and Counter-Defendant as Well as Adding Counter-Claimant and Counter-Defendant onto the Docket*** (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 31, 2017 Filing 56 ANSWER to Amended Complaint No. 2 for Patent Infringement and Declaratory Judgment byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Claims re '876, '272, & '601 Patents for Failure to State a Claim filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/12/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 9/14/2017. Replies due by 9/21/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 8/31/2017)
August 31, 2017 Filing 54 FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Power Integrations, Inc. bySemiconductor Components Industries, LLC, On Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/31/2017) Modified on 9/1/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/1/2017 (sfbS, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING #52 STIPULATION CONCERNING CERTAIN DEADLINES AND AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/23/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 23, 2017 Filing 52 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Certain Deadlines and Amendment of Pleadings filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/23/2017)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING #49 STIPULATION CONCERNING CERTAIN DEADLINES AND AMENDMENT OF PLEADINGS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/14/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Power Integrations, Inc.. Filed bySemiconductor Components Industries, LLC, On Semiconductor Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D, #2 Exhibit E-G, #3 Exhibit H-J)(Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
August 14, 2017 Filing 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Concerning Certain Deadlines and Amendment of Pleadings filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 8/14/2017)
July 6, 2017 Set Hearings re 48 Case Management Conference - Further, Claims Tutorial 5/11/2018 09:00 AM. Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/18/2018 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2017)
July 6, 2017 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Further Case Management Conference held on 7/6/2017.FTR Time: 11:06 - 11:38. Plaintiff Attorney: Howard Pollack, Michael Headley, Frank Scherkenbach. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum, John Neukom. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 7/6/2017)
July 5, 2017 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Neukom (Neukom, John) (Filed on 7/5/2017)
June 29, 2017 Filing 46 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (SUPPLEMENTAL) filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/29/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 45 Brief on Consolidation Pursuant to Court's Order of June 8 filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 22, 2017 Filing 44 RESPONSE to re #43 Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Brief In Support of Consolidation by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 6/22/2017)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER TERMINATING AS MOOT #42 POWER INTEGRATIONS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 42 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Consider Whether Cases Should Be Related filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. Responses due by 6/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 7, 2017 Filing 41 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2017. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2017 11:00 AM. Parties may appear at Case Management Conference by Courtcall without further order of the court. Stay continued till 07/06/2017. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2017)
June 5, 2017 Reset Hearing Dates re #39 Amended Case Schedule, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 6/6/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2019 01:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 12/2/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Jury Trial set for 12/2/2019, 12/3/2019, 12/4/2019, 12/5/2019, 12/6/2019, 12/9/2019, 12/10/2019, 12/11/2019, 12/12/2019 and 12/13/2019 09:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2017)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/2/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2017)
June 1, 2017 Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/1/2017.FTR Time: 11:34 - 11:52. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley via Courtcall, Frank Scherkenbach via Courtcall, Cliff Walker via Courtcall. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum via Courtcall. This is a text-only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 6/1/2017)
May 22, 2017 Filing 38 STATUS REPORT (JOINT) by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 5/22/2017)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER re 34 Case Management Conference - Initial, Last Day to Hear Dispositive Motions set for 6/6/2019. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2019 1:30 PM. Jury Trial set for 10/30/2019 9:00 AM before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/22/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2017)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER DENYING #18 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS FOR SIXTY DAYS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/21/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/1/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Counsel may appear by telephone without further order of the court. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Motion Hearing held on 3/16/2017 re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case or to Sever and Transfer in the Alternative filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Case Stayed 60 Days. The Court takes the matter under submission. Written order to be issued. Telephonic Status Conference set for 06/01/2017 at 11:00 AM. Counsel may appear at the Status Conference on 06/01/2017 by telephone without further order of the court. Total Time in Court: 14 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley, Howard Pollack, Frank Scherkenbach. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/16/2017)
March 16, 2017 Filing 34 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/16/2017.Total Time in Court: 06 Minutes. Court Reporter Name: Irene Rodriguez. Plaintiff Attorney: Michael Headley, Howard Pollack, Frank Scherkenbach. Defendant Attorney: Roger Fulghum. This is a text only Minute Entry (tshS, COURT STAFF)(Date Filed: 3/16/2017)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER APPROVING #30 STIPULATION SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/10/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 31 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & Proposed Order filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2017) Modified on 3/10/2017 (srnS, COURT STAFF).
March 9, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Power Integrations, Inc. ,ON Semiconductor Corp. & Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 29 Declaration of Jon Swenson in Support of #18 MOTION to Transfer Case or to Sever and Transfer in the Alternative, #20 Reply to Opposition/Response, filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Related document(s) #18 , #20 ) (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 9, 2017 Filing 28 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 3/9/2017)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REGARDING AUTHENTIFICATION OF EXHIBITS TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER OR TRANSFER AND SEVER IN THE ALTERNATIVE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 3/8/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2017)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #24 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SELECTING ADR PROCESS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/24/2017. (patentlcsjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 25 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 23, 2017 Filing 24 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Deadline for Selecting ADR Process filed by Power Integrations, Inc.. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 2/23/2017)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #22 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 2/6/2017. (blflc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
February 3, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-11128171.) filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Fulghum, Roger) (Filed on 2/3/2017)
January 13, 2017 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint re #1 with Jury Demand by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 1/13/2017) Modified on 1/13/2017 (bwS, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2017 Filing 20 REPLY (re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case or to Sever and Transfer in the Alternative ) filed byOn Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7)(Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 1/11/2017)
January 4, 2017 Filing 19 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #18 MOTION to Transfer Case or to Sever and Transfer in the Alternative ) filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Headley, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 1/4/2017)
December 21, 2016 Filing 18 MOTION to Transfer Case or to Sever and Transfer in the Alternative filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/16/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. Responses due by 1/4/2017. Replies due by 1/11/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Proposed Order)(Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 12/21/2016)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO RELATE CASE. Power Integrations, Inc. v. ON Semiconductor Corporation, Case No. 16-6371 BLF, is not related to Power Integrations, Inc. v. Fairchild Semiconductor International, Inc. et al., Case No. 15-4854 MMC. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 11/28/16. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 16 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT filed by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC. (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 15 Certificate of Interested Entities by On Semiconductor Corporation, Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 23, 2016 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Vensel Swenson (Swenson, Jon) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
November 21, 2016 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 3/09/2017. Case Management Conference set for 3/16/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Beth Labson Freeman. All other deadlines associated with the initial case management conference are adjusted accordingly. The Court does not issue a revised Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/blf This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2016)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/16/16. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 15, 2016 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Power Integrations, Inc... (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/15/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC.. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to On Semiconductor Corporation. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 7 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent (cc: form and complaint e-mailed to register). (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 2, 2016 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/16/2016. (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/25/2017. Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2017 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 4 Proposed Summons. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 3 Proposed Summons. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Power Integrations, Inc. (Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2016)
November 1, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-10899183.). Filed byPower Integrations, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Headley, Michael) (Filed on 11/1/2016)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Power Integrations, Inc. v. On Semiconductor Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Power Integrations, Inc.
Represented By: Howard Glenn Pollack
Represented By: Michael Richard Headley
Represented By: Frank Everett Scherkenbach
Represented By: Brian Patrick Boyd
Represented By: Whitney Allyse Reichel
Represented By: Sabrina Dawn Wilson
Represented By: Warren Keith Mabey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On Semiconductor Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas Alfred Schuneman
Represented By: Joshua D Engel
Represented By: Brett Jason Thompsen
Represented By: Jon Vensel Swenson
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Seth Adam Lindner
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jon Vensel Swenson
Represented By: Colette Reiner Mayer
Represented By: Nicholas Alfred Schuneman
Represented By: Joshua D Engel
Represented By: John M. Neukom
Represented By: Roger Fulghum
Represented By: Brett Jason Thompsen
Represented By: Seth Adam Lindner
Represented By: Bryan Joseph Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?