RHUB Communications, Inc. v. Karon

Plaintiff: RHUB Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Roy Karon
Case Number: 5:2016cv06669
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Howard R. Lloyd
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 33 RHUB COMMUNICATIONS, INC.'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/16/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2017)
August 7, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND AND DENYING IN PART 20 DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 8/7/2017. (blflc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2017)
February 22, 2017 22 Opinion or Order of the Court Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re: Case Nos. 16-cv-06669 and 17-cv-00673 signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 2/22/2017. (hrllc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RHUB Communications, Inc. v. Karon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHUB Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Frank Edward Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Karon
Represented By: Anthony Francis Basile
Represented By: Daniel L. Casas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?