Envista, LLC et al v. Audintel, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Envista, LLC and Envista Concepts, LLC
Defendant: Audintel, Inc. and Raghvendra Sinha
Case Number: 5:2016cv06765
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Haywood S Gilliam
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 48 Stipulation Re 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and/or Improper Venue to Continue Hearing. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
March 3, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 31 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan O. Hafen. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2017)
February 23, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 28 MOTION FOR AN ORDER PERMITTING WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OFCOUNSEL. Attorney Christian E. Picone and Kathleen Fitzgerald Sherman terminated. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Envista, LLC et al v. Audintel, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envista, LLC
Represented By: Christian E. Picone
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Envista Concepts, LLC
Represented By: Christian E. Picone
Represented By: Kathleen Fitzgerald Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audintel, Inc.
Represented By: Chad Spencer Pehrson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raghvendra Sinha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?