Fresh & Best Produce, Inc. v. Oaktown Ventures, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Fresh & Best Produce, Inc.
Defendant: Oaktown Ventures, LLC and Richard Hackett
Case Number: 5:2016cv06991
Filed: December 6, 2016
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Jose Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Nature of Suit: Agricultural Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSTRUING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL'S DECLARATION AS A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; GRANTING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT RICHARD HACKETT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 7/14/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2017)
June 12, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 22 MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT 14 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT OAKTOWN VENTURES, LLC ONLY, AND TO DENY DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT HACKETT. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 6/12/2017. (blflc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2017)
May 12, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING PERSONAL JURISDICTION OVER DEFENDANT RICHARD HACKETT AND REGARDING ATTORNEY QUALIFICATIONS. Re: Dkt. No. 14 . Fresh & Best must provide supplemental briefing by 5/17/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 5/12/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2017)
March 30, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Re: Dkt. No. 14 . Fresh & Best to file a brief not to exceed 10 pages addressing each of the Eitel factors by 4/7/2017. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/30/2017. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2017)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fresh & Best Produce, Inc. v. Oaktown Ventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fresh & Best Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Susan E. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oaktown Ventures, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?